Ring Plus, Inc. v. Sprint Spectrum L.P. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Ronald Sw Lew |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00835 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 01, 2017 2:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Sprint Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Sprint Spectrum L.P.
|
|
Plaintiff
Ring Plus, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Thu 02/16 5:59 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (shb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Errata
Tue 02/14 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Ring Plus, Inc.. correcting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))15 (Mowery, Jerry) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 02/13 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Ring Plus, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Mowery, Jerry) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 02/13 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Ring Plus, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Mowery, Jerry) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/06 11:05 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Sprint Spectrum L.P., a Delaware limited liability partnership. (shb) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/06 11:03 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Sprint Corporation, a Kansas corporation. (shb) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Summons Request
Fri 02/03 10:31 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ring Plus, Inc.. (Mowery, Jerry) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Summons Request
Fri 02/03 10:30 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ring Plus, Inc.. (Mowery, Jerry) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Thu 02/02 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request5 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) |
|
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 02/02 4:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 02/02 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Thu 02/02 9:30 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Ring Plus, Inc..(Mowery, Jerry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/02 9:17 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Ring Plus, Inc. identifying Promotel as Corporate Parent. (Mowery, Jerry) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Thu 02/02 8:34 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ring Plus, Inc.. (Mowery, Jerry) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Declaration
Thu 02/02 8:17 AM
DECLARATION of Jerry Mowery re E-Rules filed by Plaintiff Ring Plus, Inc.. (Mowery, Jerry) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 02/02 8:15 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintff Ring Plus, Inc., identifying Promotel. (Mowery, Jerry) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 02/02 8:03 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ring Plus, Inc.. (Mowery, Jerry) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 02/02 8:01 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19293588 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ring Plus, Inc.. (Attorney Jerry L Mowery, Jr added to party Ring Plus, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mowery, Jerry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 |