EDDYSTONE RAIL COMPANY, LLC v. BRIDGER LOGISTICS, LLC et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joshua D Wolson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00495 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 02, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 01, 2017 5:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
BRIDGER LOGISTICS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FERRELLGAS PARTNERS, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FERRELLGAS, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEREMY GAMBOA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JULIO RIOS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EDDYSTONE RAIL COMPANY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
773 | 773
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Mon 07/22 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re761 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment), filed by BRIDGER TRANSPORTATION, LLC, BRIDGER LOGISTICS, LLC, BRIDGER ENERGY, LLC, FERRELLGAS PARTNERS, L.P.,771 Notice of Cross Appeal (Credit Card Payment) filed by EDDYSTONE RAIL COMPANY, LLC. USCA Case Number 24-2284 (er) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
772 | 772
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Tue 07/16 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re771 Notice of Cross Appeal (Credit Card Payment) filed by EDDYSTONE RAIL COMPANY, LLC. USCA Case Number 24-2239 (dt) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
771 | 771
appeal
Notice of Cross Appeal (Credit Card Payment)
Mon 07/15 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to753 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion),,,,, by EDDYSTONE RAIL COMPANY, LLC. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number APAEDC-17599023. (BARBER, STEVEN) |