Phelps Dunbar LLP v. ZLOOP, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11660
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11660
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50049 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ZLOOP, Inc., by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phelps Dunbar LLP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 06/06 10:32 PM
Affidavit of Service for service of (1) Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding [Adv. Docket No. 15] and (2) [Signed] Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding [Adv. Docket No. 16] Filed by Phelps Dunbar LLP. (Robinson, Colin) Modified docket text on 6/7/2017 (LMD) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Mon 06/05 2:56 PM
Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Order Signed on 6/5/2017. (LMD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 06/05 2:57 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50049 Closed (LMD) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Fri 06/02 4:33 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Phelps Dunbar LLP. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 05/16 11:09 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Phelps Dunbar LLP. (Robinson, Colin) Modified docket text on 5/16/2017 (LMD) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Fri 05/12 3:16 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time. Order Signed on 5/12/2017. (NAB) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation
Fri 05/12 9:38 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Between Phelps Dunbar LLP and ZLOOP, Inc. by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al. . Filed by Phelps Dunbar LLP . (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Wed 05/10 1:52 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Zloop, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/11/2017 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Dick, R.) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/09 4:34 PM
Certificate of Service for Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 11, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Filed by Zloop, Inc.. (Dick, R.) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 05/09 11:04 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Zloop, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/11/2017 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Dick, R.) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Motion
Mon 04/10 4:47 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Zloop, Inc. by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry', Plan Administrator, et al.. (Dick, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Opening Brief | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Wed 03/22 3:45 PM
Affidavit of Service of Caroline E. Dougherty Filed by Zloop, Inc. by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry', Plan Administrator, et al.. (Heath, Paul) Modified docket text on 3/22/2017 (LMD) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Stipulation
Thu 03/16 3:25 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time Order Signed on 3/16/2017. (LMD) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Thu 03/16 11:14 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Zloop, Inc. by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry', Plan Administrator, et al.. Hearing scheduled for 3/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Heath, Paul) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stipulation
Fri 03/10 4:28 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time Between ZLOOP, Inc. and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al. . Filed by ZLOOP, Inc.. (Dick, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/13 5:25 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50049 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8340401, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/10 10:10 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant ZLOOP, Inc. by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. In An Adversary Proceeding Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/11/2017. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 02/10 9:28 PM
Adversary case 17-50049 Complaint /Adversary Complaint by PHELPS DUNBAR LLP against ZLOOP, Inc. by and through Patrick Trae' O'Pry, Plan Administrator, et al.. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/11/2017. (Sandler, Bradford) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Engagement Letter |