East Coast Test Prep LLC, et al v. Uhura Russ, et al
Original Case: 0:15-cv-03705
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01396 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | Feb 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 27, 2017 2:22 AM CST |
Defendant
Allnurses.com, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
David R. Smits, as Administrator of the Estate of Brian Short
|
|
Defendant
Lisa Dukes
|
|
Defendant
Jennifer Moeller
|
|
Defendant
ABC Companies 1-10
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Uhura Russ, also known as LadyFree28
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
East Coast Test Prep LLC, doing business as Achieve Test Prep
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Mark Olynyk
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/27/2017 2:22 AM CST |
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, Location STP, Comments: Dist. Ct. Doc. #122, Source Location: DC, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 02/17/2016, No. of Pgs.: 31, Court Reporter: Heichert, Staci [4504472] 17-1396 (CYZ) |
||
Civil case docketed. [4504399] 17-1396 (CYZ) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 1/24/2017 [4504407] 17-1396 (CYZ) |