Field v. American Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-01294
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-01294
Hawaii Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert J Faris |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-90003 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
American Savings Bank, F.S.B.
PO Box 2300
Honolulu, HI 96804 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dane S. Field
Bankruptcy Trustee PO Box 4198
Honolulu, HI 96812 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 1:05 PM HST |
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation
Thu 11/16 2:53 PM
Stipulation By and Between Dane S. Field and Defendant American Savings Bank, F.S.B. of Dismissal With Prejudice . Filed by Alika L. Piper. (Piper, Alika) |
|
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 11/16 2:56 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (A.P. No. 1:17-ap-90003). (DM) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
court
Minutes - General (VIRTUAL)
Tue 10/24 12:29 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 10/23/2017. (RF). Disposition: 1)M/Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of the complaint and 2) Defendant ASB Cross M/Summary Judgment are continued to 12/15/17 @ 10:00 a.m. for furher status. Appearances: Simon Kleavnsky (trustee-Field); Curtis Ching (USTR); Wayne Mau (ASB). (OV) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
audio
Mon 10/23 3:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/23/2017 2:01:42 AM ]. File Size [ 664 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:46 ]. (admin) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
audio
Fri 08/11 11:50 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/11/2017 10:02:52 AM ]. File Size [ 448 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:52 ]. (admin) |
|
29 | 29
court
Minutes - General (VIRTUAL)
Fri 08/11 10:51 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 8/11/2017. (RF). Disposition: 1)Plaintiff's M/Partial Summary Judgment and 2)Defendant's Cross M/Summary Judgment - settlement reached in both matters. The trustee will file a motion to approve settlement in the main case for hearing date assignment of 10/23/17 @ 2:00 p.m. to allow time to documement the terms. Therefore, the motions to be heard today are continued to the same date and time as the settlement motion. Appearances: Simon Klevansky/Elaine Chow (plaintiff); Wayne Mau (defendant). (courtrm,ov) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/04 1:02 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Simon Klevansky. . (Klevansky, Simon) |
|
27 | 27
answer
Response (NEW EVENT - USE FOR ALL RESPONSES)
Fri 08/04 12:50 PM
Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of the Complaint and in Opposition to Defendant American Savings Bank, F.S.B.'s Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaratory Judgment as to Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Dane S. Field. . (Klevansky, Simon) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
answer
Response (NEW EVENT - USE FOR ALL RESPONSES)
Fri 07/21 10:09 AM
Amended Opposition of American Savings Bank, FSB to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count I and (2) Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaratory Judgment as to Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum in Support. Filed by Defendant American Savings Bank, F.S.B.. . (Mau, Wayne) Modified on 7/21/2017 (DM) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Concise Statement of Material Facts
Fri 07/21 10:02 AM
Concise Statement of Material Facts by American Savings Bank, FSB . Filed by Wayne K.T. Mau on behalf of American Savings Bank, F.S.B.. . (Mau, Wayne). Modified on 7/21/2017 [Clerk's Note: Added relation to Dkt #21 ,26 .] (DM) |
|
24 | 24
court
Advisory Entry
Fri 07/21 8:36 AM
Advisory Entry: Dkt #21 filed incorrectly as a Motion for Summary Judgment. Filer advised to refile as a Memorandum in Opposition . . (DM) |
|
23 | 23
court
Advisory Entry
Fri 07/21 8:33 AM
Advisory Entry: Dkt #22 filed incorrectly as a Motion for Summary Judgment; filer advised to refile as a Concise Statement of Material Facts . . (DM) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Summary Judgment (Motion)
Thu 07/20 9:03 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment American Savings Bank, FSB Concise Statement re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Filed by Wayne K.T. Mau on behalf of American Savings Bank, F.S.B.. (Mau, Wayne) Modified on 7/21/2017 [Clerk's Note: This document should have been filed as a Concise Statement of Material Facts; filer advised to refile.] (DM) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Summary Judgment (Motion)
Thu 07/20 8:59 PM
Opposition Motion For Summary Judgment American Savings Bank, FSB Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count I . Filed by Wayne K.T. Mau on behalf of American Savings Bank, F.S.B.. (Mau, Wayne) Modified on 7/21/2017 [Clerk's Note: This document should have been filed as an Opposition; filer advised to refile using the correct event.] (DM) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Fri 06/02 11:18 AM
Stipulation By and Between Dane S. Field and Defendant American Savings Bank, F.S.B. to (A) Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint [Dkt. No. 8] and (B) Establish Briefing Schedule . Filed by Simon Klevansky. . (Klevansky, Simon) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 05/26 11:26 AM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Simon Klevansky. . (Klevansky, Simon) |
|
18 | 18
notice
1 Notice of Hearing
Fri 05/26 11:04 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing . Filed by Simon Klevansky. Hearing for:8 Motion for Summary Judgment,10 Notice of Hearing. Hearing scheduled for 8/11/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (Klevansky, Simon) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance by Counsel (No PDF)
Fri 05/19 10:16 AM
Notice of Appearance of Elaine T. Chow as Co-Counsel representing Plaintiff Dane S. Field. Counsel consents to service of notices, pleadings, and papers by court transmission facilities. This entry for record purposes only. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Sunday, May 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
[CerDocTyp]Scheduling Order in an Adversary Proceeding
Sun 05/07 6:31 PM
Scheduling Order in an Adversary Proceeding; BNC Certificate of Service Notice Date 05/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
audio
Fri 05/05 11:50 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/5/2017 10:02:29 AM ]. File Size [ 480 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:00 ]. (admin) |
|
14 | 14
court
Minutes - Scheduling Conference (VIRTUAL)
Fri 05/05 11:10 AM
Scheduling Order and Minutes of Scheduling Conference held on: 5/5/2017. (RF). Appearances: Alika Piper (plaintiff); Dane Field present; Wayne Mau (defendant). Trial date set for 5/8/2018 at 09:30 a.m. at USBC Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. Discovery is to be completed by 4/6/2018. The Scheduling Order will be served by ECF notification. (courtrm,ov) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/27 7:41 AM
Certificate of Service re: (12) Defendant American Savings Bank, F.S.B.'s Scheduling Conference Statement dated April 27, 2017 . Filed by Wayne K.T. Mau. (Mau, Wayne). Modified on 4/27/2017 [Clerk's Note: Added relation to Dkt #12 .] (DM) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Thu 04/27 7:37 AM
Scheduling Conference Statement . Filed by Wayne K.T. Mau on behalf of American Savings Bank, F.S.B.. (Mau, Wayne) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/21 3:36 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Nicole D. Stucki. . (Stucki, Nicole) |
|
10 | 10
notice
1 Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/21 3:03 PM
Notice of Hearing . Filed by Nicole D. Stucki. Hearing for:8 Motion for Summary Judgment. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (Stucki, Nicole) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Concise Statement of Material Facts
Fri 04/21 2:59 PM
Concise Statement of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of the Complaint . Filed by Nicole D. Stucki on behalf of Dane S. Field. . (Stucki, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) "1" through "4" | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) "5" through "8" | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Nicole D. Stucki | ||
8 | 8
motion
Summary Judgment (Motion)
Fri 04/21 2:28 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of the Complaint; Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of the Complaint . Filed by Nicole D. Stucki on behalf of Dane S. Field. (Stucki, Nicole) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/10 11:15 AM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Nicole D. Stucki. . (Stucki, Nicole) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Mon 04/10 11:01 AM
Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff . Filed by Nicole D. Stucki on behalf of Dane S. Field. (Stucki, Nicole) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Scheduling / Status Conference
Fri 04/07 10:33 AM
Amended Notice of Scheduling / Status Conference . Filed by American Savings Bank, F.S.B.. Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (Mau, Wayne) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/22 12:10 PM
Answer to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment as to the Validity and Perfection of Purported Liens on Debtor's Vehicles filed February 24, 2017, Filed by American Savings Bank, F.S.B.. (Mau, Wayne) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Certficate of Service of Summons
Thu 03/09 1:07 PM
Third Party Certificate of Service of Summons and Copy of Complaint on American Savings Bank, F.S.B. 2/28/2017 (Acknowledgment of Service [Wayne K. T. Mau, Esq., on Behalf of Defendant American Savings Bank, F.S.B.] . (Stucki, Nicole) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons (AP)
Mon 02/27 12:34 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding - Summons Issued on: American Savings Bank, F.S.B.. Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (Stucki, Nicole) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/24 2:43 PM
Adversary case 17-90003 ADVERSARY PROCEEDING OPENED. 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property): Complaint by Dane S. Field against American Savings Bank, F.S.B.. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property))(Stucki, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |