Weiss v. Grassi et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:12-bk-10105
Lead BK case is: 8:12-bk-10105
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Catherine E Bauer |
Case #: | 8:17-ap-01043 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mark Grassi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jami Lee Grassi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Weiss, Trustee of the Walldesign Liquidation Trust
Landau Gottfried & Berger LLP 1801 Century Park East Suite 700
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 09/23/2024 1:05 PM PDT |
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 11/20 12:43 PM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-1043 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Thu 10/11 1:16 PM
Hearing Held - OFF CALENDAR - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ADVERSARY FILED ON 10/9/18. (Le, James) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Notice of dismissal (Adversary)
Tue 10/09 5:02 PM
Notice of dismissal (Adversary) per attached stipulation for dismissal (Le, James) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Tue 10/09 10:44 AM
Stipulation By Brian Weiss and Defendants to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Brian Weiss |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 08/09 10:27 AM
Hearing Continued Status hearing to be held on 10/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Le, James) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status report
Mon 08/06 10:49 AM
Status report Joint Status Report [LBR 7016-1 (a)(2)] Filed by Plaintiff Brian Weiss . |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 04/12 2:15 PM
Hearing Continued Status hearing to be held on 8/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status report
Thu 04/05 11:29 AM
Status report Joint Status Report [LBR 7016-1 (a)(2)] Filed by Plaintiff Brian Weiss . |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 12/14 2:55 PM
Hearing Continued Status hearing to be held on 4/11/2018 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status report
Thu 12/07 11:33 AM
Status report Joint Status Report [LBR 7016-1(a)(2)] Filed by Plaintiff Brian Weiss . |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 09/07 10:10 AM
Hearing Continued Status hearing to be held on 12/13/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status report
Mon 08/28 10:49 AM
Status report Joint Status Report [LBR 7016-1(a)(2)] Filed by Plaintiff Brian Weiss . |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 06/08 3:09 PM
Hearing Continued Status hearing to be held on 9/6/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status report
Thu 05/25 11:11 AM
Status report Joint Status Report [LBR 7016-1(a)(2)] Filed by Plaintiff Brian Weiss . |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/20 4:37 PM
Answer to Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Fraudulent Transfers Filed by Jami Lee Grassi, Mark Grassi. (Napolitano, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 03/22 12:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jami Lee Grassi 3/22/2017; Mark Grassi 3/22/2017 |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 2:15 PM
Summons Issued on Jami Lee Grassi Date Issued 3/21/2017, Answer Due 4/20/2017; Mark Grassi Date Issued 3/21/2017, Answer Due 4/20/2017 Status hearing to be held on 6/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 11:16 AM
Adversary case 8:17-ap-01043. Complaint by Brian Weiss against Mark Grassi, Jami Lee Grassi. (Charge To Estate)Fee Amount $350. Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Fraudulent Transfers Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Modified on 3/21/2017 (Mccall, Audrey) |