Arabella Operating, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40120
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40120
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mark X Mullin |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-41479 |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Arabella Operating, LLC
PO Box 506
Fort Worth, TX 76101-0506 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 15, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
order
Final decree
Thu 07/15 12:57 PM
Final decree (Case closed) . Entered on 7/15/2021 (McCrory, J.) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Certificate (generic)
Tue 07/13 3:15 PM
Certificate of No Objection filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC . (Hillegonds, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Certificate of service
Thu 06/17 12:39 PM
Certificate of service re: Post-Confirmation Report and Application for Final Decree filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC . (Hillegonds, Rachel) |
|
40 | 40
motion
Final decree
Thu 06/17 12:36 PM
Amended Motion for final decree with negative notice Filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC (Hillegonds, Rachel) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Final decree
Mon 06/14 1:51 PM
Motion for final decree Post-Confirmation Report and Application for Final Decree Filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC (Hillegonds, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Fri 09/06 10:47 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 28 Filed by Creditor V-F Petroleum, Inc.. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
37 | 37
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Fri 09/06 10:45 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 21 Filed by Creditor The New Mexico Company, Inc.. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
36 | 36
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Fri 09/06 10:41 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 26 Filed by Creditor Tango Investments, LLC. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
35 | 35
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Fri 09/06 10:39 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 25 Filed by Creditor Steven L Burleson. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
34 | 34
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Fri 09/06 10:36 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 19 Filed by Creditor Kennedy Minerals, Ltd.. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
33 | 33
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Fri 09/06 10:34 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 17 Filed by Creditor Dingus Investments, Inc.. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
32 | 32
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Fri 09/06 10:32 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 13 Filed by Creditor Angler Oil & Gas, LLC. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Fri 08/30 11:11 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 27 Filed by Creditor Two Hats Ventures, LLC. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
30 | 30
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Fri 08/30 11:10 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 15 Filed by Creditor The de Compiegne Property Company No. 20, Ltd.. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Thu 08/29 10:58 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 24 Filed by Creditor Split Rock Energy. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
28 | 28
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Thu 08/29 10:55 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: 22 Filed by Creditor Safari Energy, LP. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of service
Fri 01/04 8:47 AM
Certificate of service re: Order Granting Claim Objection filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC . (Hillegonds, Rachel) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Regarding objection
Wed 01/02 10:00 AM
Order regarding objection to claim number(s) 3 . Entered on 1/2/2019 (McCrory, J.) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing held
Fri 12/28 8:44 AM
Hearing held on 12/27/2018. ***SUSTAINED*** (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Certificate of service
Thu 11/29 3:33 PM
Certificate of service re: Objection to Claim No. 3 and Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC . (Hillegonds, Rachel) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of hearing
Thu 11/29 3:23 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC . Hearing to be held on 12/27/2018 at 01:30 PM Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm. for23 , (Hillegonds, Rachel) |
|
23 | 23
claims
Objection to claim
Thu 11/29 3:22 PM
Objection to claim(s) 3 of Creditor(s) Terry C. Almaraz.. Filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC. (Hillegonds, Rachel) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
court
Case reassigned
Wed 11/21 12:04 PM
Judge Mark X. Mullin assigned. Involvement of Judge Russell F. Nelms terminated per Order #528 entered in Lead Case No. 17-40120 on 11/21/18. (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Thu 09/06 4:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Creditor Tonie A. Allard . (Kucera, J.) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC certificate of mailing
Wed 12/13 11:32 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
claims
Assignment/Transfer of claim
Fri 12/08 12:00 PM
Assignment/Transfer of claim. Fee Amount $25. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferor: Bart M. Schwartz, as SEC Receiver (Claim No. 7) To 30294, LLC. To 30294, LLCc/o Clay TaylorBonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones LLP420 Throckmorton St., Ste. 1000Fort Worth, TX 76102 Filed by Creditor 30294, LLC. (Taylor, Clay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 12/08 12:03 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Assignment/Transfer of claim 17-41479 rfn11) [claims,trasclm] ( 25.00). Receipt number 24540564, amount $ 25.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
court
Meeting of creditors held
Fri 05/19 12:13 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 5/19/2017 (Schmidt, Erin) |
||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order (generic)
Wed 05/03 10:22 AM
Order Authorizing & Approving Arabella Operating, LLC's (I) Retention & Employment of Rehmann Turnaround & Receivership & (II) Employment of Charles Hoebeke as Chief Restructuring Officer. Entered on 5/3/2017. (Maldino, Mark) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Thu 04/27 4:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers by Joseph F Postnikoff filed by Creditor Jason Hoisager. (Postnikoff, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Joint administration
Thu 04/13 1:03 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 4:17-bk-40120 with member case 4:2017-bk-41479-rfn.ORDERED that all orders, pleadings, papers and documents, except proofs of claim, shall be filed and docketed in the case of Arabella Exploration, LLC, Case Number 17-40120 (the Lead Case), Entered on 4/13/2017. (Kucera, J.) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing held
Wed 04/12 4:20 PM
Hearing held on 4/12/2017. ***GRANTED*** (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Tue 04/11 3:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Randall L. Rouse filed by Interested Party Lynch, Chappell & Alsup. (Rouse, Randall) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Expedite hearing
Mon 04/10 3:04 PM
Order granting motion for expedited hearing (document set for hearing:6 Motion for joint administration) Hearing to be held on 4/12/2017 at 01:30 PM Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm. for6 , Entered on 4/10/2017. (Kucera, J.) |
|
Saturday, April 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors
Sat 04/08 11:35 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/08/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC certificate of mailing
Fri 04/07 11:36 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of service
Fri 04/07 11:00 AM
Certificate of service re: Official Form 309F - Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC . (Battaglia, Ray) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Fri 04/07 10:03 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kimberly A. Walsh filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Walsh, Kimberly) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Thu 04/06 2:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel P. Callahan filed by Platinum Partners Credit Opportunities Master Fund, LP, Platinum Long Term Growth VIII, LLC. (Callahan, Daniel) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of hearing
Thu 04/06 10:37 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC . Hearing to be held on 4/12/2017 at 01:30 PM Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm. for6 , (Battaglia, Ray) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Thu 04/06 10:07 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Donald Paul Stecker filed by Creditor Reeves County. (Stecker, Donald) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Expedite hearing
Wed 04/05 3:14 PM
Motion for expedited hearin Filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC (Battaglia, Ray) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
7
pgs
motion
Joint administration
Wed 04/05 3:11 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases Arabella Exploration, LLC and Arabella Operating, LLC Filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC (Battaglia, Ray) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
court
Meeting of creditors chapter 11 & 12
Wed 04/05 3:06 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 8/17/2017. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 05/5/2017. (Neary, William) |
|
4 | 4
court
Notice of deficiency
Wed 04/05 8:49 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 4/18/2017. Schedule D due 4/18/2017. Schedule E/F due 4/18/2017. Schedule G due 4/18/2017. Schedule H due 4/18/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 4/18/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/18/2017. (Blanco, J.) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor
Tue 04/04 3:03 PM
Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor . Filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC. (Battaglia, Ray) |
|
2 | 2
misc
20 Largest unsecured creditors
Tue 04/04 3:00 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor Arabella Operating, LLC. (Battaglia, Ray) |
|
1 | 1
32
pgs
misc
Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer)
Tue 04/04 2:54 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Arabella Operating, LLC (Battaglia, Ray) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 04/04 2:56 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 17-41479 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 23526062, amount $1717.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |