Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11129

Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Catherine J Furay
Case #: 1:17-ap-00024
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2017
Terminated:Jun 28, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Superior Choice Credit Union
2817 Tower Avenue
Superior, WI 54880
Represented By
Superior Choice Credit Union
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Wayne DeRosia
2024 East 7th Street
Superior, WI 54880
Represented By
Nathan M. Cockerham
Maki, Ledin, Bick & Olson
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristy Lynn DeRosia
2024 East 7th Street
Superior, WI 54880
Represented By
Nathan M. Cockerham
Maki, Ledin, Bick & Olson
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/28 1:13 PM
Adversary Case Closed. (Eau Claire, Monica)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
14 14 order Stipulation to Dismiss Case ( Adversary) Fri 06/02 4:29 PM
Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Case Related [+] cc: parties in int. Signed on 6/2/2017. (Eau Claire, Brenda L)
Related: [-] 11
13 13 court Hearing: Canceled Fri 06/02 9:17 AM
Pretrial Conference Canceled re: Complaint . Originally scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 02:40 PM . Canceled due to: Filing of Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Case. Related [+]. (Eau Claire, Brenda L)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, June 01, 2017
12 12 miscad Proposed Order - attorney adversary Thu 06/01 10:23 AM
Proposed Order Related [+] filed by Attorney Parrish J. Jones on behalf of Superior Choice Credit Union . Order to be signed on or after 6/2/2017. (Jones, Parrish)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Stipulation Dismiss Case Thu 06/01 10:22 AM
Stipulation between Superior Choice Credit Union and Plaintiffs to Dismiss Case filed by Parrish J. Jones on behalf of Superior Choice Credit Union. Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kristy Lynn DeRosia, Plaintiff Matthew Wayne DeRosia. (Jones, Parrish)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2017
10 10 chap Hearing Rescheduled (BHL conference line) - use to reschedule Fri 05/26 3:44 PM
Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 02:40 PM by Telephone Conference on Complaint. (This reschedules the pre-trial conference previously set for 06/13/2017 at 01:50 PM - rescheduled at the request of the Court.) Parties should call the Court conference line at 1-888-808-6929, access code 4896101##, to participate in this telephonic hearing. ***This docket entry serves as electronic notice.*** Related [+] (tg )
Related: [-] 1
Monday, April 24, 2017
court Refund Issued Tue 04/25 9:11 AM
Refund issued to Nathan Cockerham in the amount of $ 350.00 with #061854 Reversal of Credit Card Transaction. Reason for Refund: no fee due . (Madison, Tina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
9 9 order Application for Refund of Filing Fee Fri 04/21 9:05 AM
Order Granting Application for Refund of Filing Fee Related [+] Signed on 4/20/2017. (Eau Claire, Monica)
Related: [-] #4
Monday, April 10, 2017
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/10 10:50 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Parrish J. Jones on behalf of Superior Choice Credit Union.(Jones, Parrish)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (s)
Att: 2 Exhibit (s) Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit (s) Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit (s) Exhibit D
7 7 miscad Proof of Service Mon 04/10 8:35 AM
Proof of Service filed by Nathan M. Cockerham on behalf of Kristy Lynn DeRosia, Matthew Wayne DeRosia. Related document(s)1 ,5 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kristy Lynn DeRosia, Plaintiff Matthew Wayne DeRosia, Summons Issued. (Cockerham, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2017
6 6 court Preliminary Pretrial Order (auto form) Thu 04/06 11:57 AM
Preliminary Pretrial Order. Signed on 4/6/2017. Related [+]. (Eau Claire, Monica)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 court Summons Issued (auto form) Thu 04/06 11:55 AM
Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 6/13/2017 at 01:50 PM at Telephone Conference on Complaint . Summons Issued on Superior Choice Credit Union Answer Due 5/8/2017. Related [+]. (Eau Claire, Monica)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 motion Refund of Filing Fee Thu 04/06 11:53 AM
Application for Refund of $350 filed by Nathan M. Cockerham on behalf of Kristy Lynn DeRosia, Matthew Wayne DeRosia. Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kristy Lynn DeRosia, Plaintiff Matthew Wayne DeRosia. (Eau Claire, Monica)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Corrective Entry Thu 04/06 11:52 AM
Corrective Entry: Incorrect event chosen. Clerk will redocket for clerical purposes . Related [+]. (Eau Claire, Monica)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
2 2 miscad Letter Wed 04/05 1:48 PM
Letter filed by Nathan M. Cockerham on behalf of Kristy Lynn DeRosia, Matthew Wayne DeRosia. (Cockerham, Nathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/05 1:13 PM
Adversary case 1 17-00024 Complaint filed by Matthew Wayne DeRosia, Kristy Lynn DeRosia against Superior Choice Credit Union [ Fee Amount $ 350]. Nature of Suit: 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property) (Cockerham, Nathan)
Related: [-]