Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-08589

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:17-ap-00332
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2017
Terminated:May 18, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pastore Custom Builders, Inc.
Represented By
Pastore Custom Builders, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Carol Fox
GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group LLC 200 E Broward Blvd. Suite #1010
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
David C Cimo
Genovese Joblove & Batista PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, April 16, 2018
8 8 motion Motion for Substitution of Counsel Mon 04/16 5:30 PM
Motion for Substitution of Counsel Filed by Paul J Battista on behalf of Plaintiff Carol Fox, plan administrator of and for the estates of the reorganized Debtors. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/18 9:05 AM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-332 Closed. (Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
7 7 misc Stipulation Wed 05/17 10:00 PM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Filed by David C Cimo on behalf of Plaintiff Carol Fox, plan administrator of and for the estates of the reorganized Debtors Related [+]. (Cimo, David)
Related: [-] 1
Sunday, May 14, 2017
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/15 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/14/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Friday, May 12, 2017
5 5 court Notice Of Deficient Document (ap) Fri 05/12 2:24 PM
Notice of Deficient Document Related [+]. Compliance required no later than 5/31/2017. (Dianna)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, May 09, 2017
4 4 misc Stipulation Tue 05/09 3:00 PM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Filed by David C Cimo on behalf of Plaintiff Carol Fox, plan administrator of and for the estates of the reorganized Debtors Related [+]. (Cimo, David)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, April 13, 2017
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 04/13 5:41 PM
Service Executed of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1 on Joseph Pastore, Registered Agent and President of Pastore Custom Builders, Inc. Filed by David C Cimo on behalf of Plaintiff Carol Fox, plan administrator of and for the estates of the reorganized Debtors Related [+]. (Cimo, David)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/13 12:00 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 05/15/2017. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Tue 04/11 4:53 PM
Complaint by Carol Fox against Pastore Custom Builders, Inc.. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [12 Related [+]]. (Cimo, David)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference