Cadogan Management, LLC v. Braun
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:17-ap-03024 |
Nature of Suit | 65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Aaron Hugh Braun
45 Evergreen Drive
Greenbrae, CA 94904 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cadogan Management, LLC
Dennis D. Miller Lubin Olson & Niewiadomski LLP 600 Montgomery Street, 14th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 05/24 1:15 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:17-ap-3024. (kl) |
||
Sunday, April 08, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Sun 04/08 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 04/08/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
3
pgs
order
Judgment on Complaint
Fri 04/06 11:10 AM
Judgment of NonDischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 523(a)(4) - Breach of Fiduciary Duty . Case Management Action due after 4/19/2018. (lp) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/05 12:56 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Judgment | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice
Thu 04/05 12:49 PM
Notice Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Partial Dismissal of Claims . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC. (Miller, Dennis) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
audio
audio
Fri 03/16 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/16/2018 10:27:56 AM ]. File Size [ 25987 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:48:17 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Fri 03/16 3:53 PM
Hearing Held. The status conference is taken off calendar. Mr. Miller will upload a form of final judgment. (lp) |
||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Tue 03/06 8:52 AM
Hearing Continued Hearing scheduled for 03/16/2018 at 10:00 AM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp) |
||
Saturday, February 03, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Sat 02/03 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 02/03/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Thu 02/01 3:48 PM
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part, Cadogan Management, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (dmf) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/29 3:50 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Wed 01/24 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 01/24/2018. (Admin.) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Wed 01/24 11:25 AM
Hearing Continued Hearing scheduled for 03/09/2018 at 11:00 AM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
10
pgs
order
Memorandum Decision
Mon 01/22 3:51 PM
Memorandum Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . (lp) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Conference Statement
Wed 01/17 2:53 PM
Status Conference Statement. Related document(s)3 Summons Issued. Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk added linkage to document #3. Modified on 1/18/2018 (yw) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 12/08 1:15 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Supplemental Document
Fri 12/08 1:13 PM
Supplemental Document Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC's Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Support . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) DEFECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect event code selected. Modified on 12/11/2017 (wbk) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
audio
audio
Fri 11/17 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/17/2017 10:38:49 AM ]. File Size [ 9884 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:41:11 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Fri 11/17 1:42 PM
Hearing Held. The matter stands submitted pending the parties filing additional briefing. The plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief by 12/8/17; defendant may respond by 12/22/17. (lp) |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Reply
Thu 11/09 4:18 PM
Reply Cadogan Management, LLC's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to Defendant Aaron Hugh Braun's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Request for Dismissal of the Plaintiff's Adversary Proceeding Referenced Above . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Objections to Evidence | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 11/08 10:44 AM
Defendant Aaron Hugh Braun's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Request for Dismissal of the Plaintiff's Adversary Proceeding Referenced Above, Certificate of Service . Filed by Defendant Aaron Hugh Braun (jmb) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/11 4:44 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 10/11 4:43 PM
Notice of Hearing on Cadogan Management, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [11 U.S.C. § 7056] . Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC. (Miller, Dennis) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Request to Take Judicial Notice
Wed 10/11 4:39 PM
Request To Take Judicial Notice Cadogan Management, LLC's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [11 U.S.C. § 7056] . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (part 1) | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B (part 2) | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B (part 3) | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E | ||
15 | 15
motion
Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Wed 10/11 4:34 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Aaron Braun [11 U.S.C. § 7056] Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC. (Miller, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 09/29 5:07 PM
Hearing held and continued Hearing scheduled for 01/26/2018 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp ) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Request for Notice
Mon 07/17 5:14 PM
Request for Notice Scott Delman's Request for Special Notice to be Added to the Master Mailing List Filed by Interested Party Scott Delman (Call, Greg) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Wed 06/28 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 06/28/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Continue Hearing
Mon 06/26 8:33 AM
Order Rescheduling Status Conference . Status Conference scheduled for 9/29/2017 at 01:30 PM San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali for 1 , . (wbk) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Document
Tue 06/20 3:47 PM
Joint Document: Joint Discovery Plan . . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
ADR Certification Form
Fri 05/19 12:21 PM
Amended ADR Certification Form . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/15 11:42 AM
Answer to Complaint with Certificate of Service. Filed by Aaron Hugh Braun. (acb) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
ADR Certification Form
Thu 05/11 3:36 PM
ADR Certification Form Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) |
|
Saturday, April 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 04/15 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 04/14 2:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Aaron Hugh Braun 4/13/2017 . (Miller, Dennis) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/14 9:23 AM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Cadogan Management, LLC (Miller, Dennis) |
|
utility
Error
Fri 04/14 2:38 PM
**ERROR** Incorrect docket event selected. Court spoke to Dennis Miller and let him know the document needs to be refiled using the event summons service executed. He will have the document refiled as soon as possible. . (dmf) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Discovery
Thu 04/13 12:13 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (cp) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Thu 04/13 12:11 PM
Summons Issued on Aaron Hugh Braun Answer Due 5/15/2017 . Status Conference scheduled for 6/30/2017 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (cp) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Adversary Cover Sheet
Wed 04/12 3:44 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet . (Miller, Dennis) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/12 3:38 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-03024 . 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny), 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury), 65 (Dischargeability - other) Complaint by Cadogan Management, LLC against Aaron Hugh Braun. Fee Amount $350. (Miller, Dennis) |