Founders Oil & Gas Operating, LLC et al v. Arabella Exploration, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40120
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40120
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Russell F Nelms |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-04033 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Arabella Exploration, LLC
P.O. Box 506
Fort Worth,, TX 76101 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arabella Operating, LLC
P.O. Box 506
Ft. Worth, TX 76101 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Founders Oil & Gas Operating, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Founders Oil & Gas III, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Friday, July 05, 2019 | ||
court
Close adversary case
Fri 07/05 8:41 AM
Adversary case 4:17-ap-4033 closed (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
court
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document
Fri 06/21 11:33 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/21/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Dismiss adversary proceeding
Wed 06/19 9:54 AM
Order granting motion to dismiss adversary proceeding without prejudice Entered on 6/19/2019. (McCrory, J.) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Dismiss adversary proceeding
Mon 06/17 1:40 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiffs Founders Oil & Gas III, LLC, Founders Oil & Gas Operating, LLC (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
court
Clerk's correspondence
Thu 05/30 9:39 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Case Status from attorney for plaintiff. Responses due by 6/21/2019. (Levario, Tandi) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
court
Case reassigned
Wed 11/21 12:04 PM
Judge Mark X. Mullin assigned. Involvement of Judge Russell F. Nelms terminated per Order #528 entered in Lead Case No. 17-40120 on 11/21/18. (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
3
pgs
order
Abate
Mon 03/19 7:49 AM
Agreed Order granting motion to abate Entered on 3/19/2018. (McCrory, J.) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Abate
Fri 03/16 11:43 AM
Motion to abate and submit to arbitration (agreed) filed by Defendants Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC (Farrier, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
court
Request for transcript
Thu 01/18 1:47 PM
COPY Request for transcript (ruling only) regarding a hearing held on 12/21/2017. The requested turn-around time is ordinary 30 day (Levario, Tandi) |
|
Sunday, December 31, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document
Sun 12/31 11:33 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/31/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Summary judgment
Fri 12/29 2:33 PM
Order denying motion for summary judgment Entered on 12/29/2017. (Calfee, J.) |
|
26 | 26
court
Transcript
Fri 12/29 12:41 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 12/21/2017 (13 pages) RE: Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment (#8). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 03/29/2018. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. . Transcript to be made available to the public on 03/29/2018. |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
court
Request for transcript
Thu 12/21 4:50 PM
COPY Request for transcript (ruling only) regarding a hearing held on 12/21/2017. The requested turn-around time is 7-day expedited (Levario, Tandi) |
|
24 | 24
court
Request for transcript
Thu 12/21 4:50 PM
Request for transcript (ruling only) regarding a hearing held on 12/21/2017. The requested turn-around time is 7-day expedited (Levario, Tandi) |
|
court
Hearing held
Thu 12/21 3:27 PM
Hearing held on 12/21/2017. ***DENIED*** (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
Request for transcript
Tue 11/28 8:31 AM
COPY Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 11/16/2017. The requested turn-around time is ordinary 30 day (Levario, Tandi) |
|
22 | 22
court
Transcript
Wed 11/22 12:50 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 11/16/2017 (42 pages) RE: Motion for Summary Judgment. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 02/20/2018. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. . Transcript to be made available to the public on 02/20/2018. |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
Request for transcript
Fri 11/17 4:19 PM
Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 11/16/2017. The requested turn-around time is 7-day expedited (Levario, Tandi) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing held
Thu 11/16 3:32 PM
Hearing held on 11/16/2017. ***UNDER ADVISEMENT*** (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Abate
Thu 10/26 5:03 PM
Order granting motion to abate Adversary & Reset Pre-Trial Deadlines for Discovery . Entered on 10/26/2017. (Maldino, Mark) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing held
Mon 10/02 2:42 PM
Hearing held on 10/2/2017. ***CONTINUED*** (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Abate
Thu 09/21 4:18 PM
Joint Motion to abate extending deadlines and reset related court hearings Filed by Defendants Arabella Exploration, LLC , Arabella Operating, LLC , Plaintiffs Founders Oil & Gas III, LLC , Founders Oil & Gas Operating, LLC (Rielly, Bill) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of hearing
Thu 09/21 1:58 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendants Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC . Hearing to be held on 11/16/2017 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm. for8 , (Farrier, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing held
Tue 07/25 4:48 PM
Hearing held on 7/25/2017. ***STATUS CONFERENCE CONDUCTED*** (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of hearing
Fri 07/21 3:54 PM
Notice of hearing - status conference filed by Defendants Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC. Status Conference to be held on 7/25/2017 at 09:30 AM at Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm.. (Farrier, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of hearing
Tue 07/18 4:34 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendants Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC . Hearing to be held on 7/25/2017 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm. for8 , (Farrier, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Objection
Thu 07/13 9:33 PM
Objection to filed by Plaintiffs Founders Oil & Gas III, LLC, Founders Oil & Gas Operating, LLC. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Support/supplemental document
Thu 07/13 9:32 PM
Support/supplemental document Appendix to Plaintiffs' Response and Supporting Brief to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Founders Oil & Gas III, LLC, Founders Oil & Gas Operating, LLC . (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Brief
Thu 07/13 9:24 PM
Brief in support filed by Plaintiffs Founders Oil & Gas III, LLC, Founders Oil & Gas Operating, LLC . (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Response
Thu 07/13 9:22 PM
Response opposed to filed by Plaintiffs Founders Oil & Gas III, LLC, Founders Oil & Gas Operating, LLC. (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Brief
Wed 06/21 3:59 PM
Brief in support filed by Defendants Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC, Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC . (Farrier, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Chip Hoebeke Declaration | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. A | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. B | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. C through P | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. Q through U | ||
10 | 10
court
Clerk's correspondence
Wed 06/21 1:01 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting to refile document from attorney for defendant. Responses due by 6/23/2017. (Whitaker, Sheniqua) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Summary judgment
Mon 06/19 6:19 PM
Motion for summary judgment (Brief in Support) filed by Defendants Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC, Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC (Farrier, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Chip Hoebeke | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C through P | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Q through U | ||
8 | 8
motion
Summary judgment
Mon 06/19 5:48 PM
Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC, Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC (Farrier, Thomas) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to counterclaim
Fri 06/16 6:35 PM
Answer to counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaim filed by Founders Oil & Gas III, LLC. (Melko, John) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer|cmp
Answer to complaint|Counterclaim
Fri 05/26 10:43 AM
First Answer to complaint , First Counterclaim by Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC against Founders Oil & Gas III, LLC, Founders Oil & Gas Operating, LLC filed by Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC. (Farrier, Thomas) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons service executed
Fri 05/05 11:53 AM
Summons service executed on Arabella Operating, LLC 4/28/2017 (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Summons service executed
Fri 05/05 11:52 AM
Summons service executed on Arabella Exploration, LLC 4/28/2017 (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Thu 04/27 9:08 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 10/2/2017 at 01:30 PM at Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm.. Entered on 4/27/2017 (McCrory, J.) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons issued
Thu 04/27 9:07 AM
Summons issued on Arabella Exploration, LLC Answer Due 5/30/2017; Arabella Operating, LLC Answer Due 5/30/2017 (McCrory, J.) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/26 1:14 PM
Adversary case 17-04033 Complaint by Founders Oil & Gas Operating, LLC, Founders Oil & Gas III, LLC against Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 91 (Declaratory judgment). (Beausoleil, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E |