Bonacci v. Berryhill
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Dustin B Pead |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00348 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 13, 2018 |
Defendant
Nancy A. Berryhill
|
|
Interested Party
SSA Notice
|
|
Plaintiff
Griffin William Bonacci
|
GPO
Oct 22 2019
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/22/2019. (nl) |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Memorandum Decision
Tue 10/22 1:17 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/22/2019. (nl) |
|
34 | 34
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 10/22 11:58 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Randall, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Addendum
Mon 10/21 12:12 PM
ADDENDUM to32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci . (Borsos, John) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 10/14 10:51 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci.(Borsos, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Fee Agreement | ||
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 08/07 10:07 AM
ORDER granting 30 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/7/2018. (las) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 08/07 8:09 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Attorney Fees under the EAJA filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Randall, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Judgment
Fri 07/13 4:42 PM
JUDGMENT - It is hereby ordered that based upon Defendants unopposed Motion to Remand for Further Administrative Proceedings, the matter is remanded for further proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. §405(g). Case Closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/13/2018. (las) |
|
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to Agency
Fri 07/13 4:31 PM
ORDER granting 26 Motion to Remand to Social Security Administration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/13/2018. (las) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice Vacating Hearing
Fri 07/13 3:32 PM
NOTICE VACATING Telephonic Hearing HEARING set for July, 26, 2018 at 10:30 AM 24 before Judge Dustin B. Pead (Notice generated by DBP Chambers) (tmb) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Remand to Agency
Fri 07/13 1:42 PM
MOTION to Remand to SSA (Unopposed) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Randall, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Substitution of Counsel (Atty)
Tue 07/10 8:23 AM
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Jennifer A. Randall replacing Stephanie Lynn Fishkin Kiley as counsel on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Randall, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 06/26 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING : A Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiff's appeal of the Commissioner's decision is set for 7/26/2018 at 10:30 AM in Rm 7.100. Instructions on appearing telephonically will be emailed to the parties. (tmb) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Reply Brief
Wed 01/17 11:04 AM
REPLY BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci.(Borsos, John) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Job Description, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Job Description, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Job Description | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Brief
Thu 01/04 8:50 PM
Answer BRIEF re20 Brief filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Kiley, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Substitution of Counsel
Wed 12/13 11:47 AM
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Stephanie Lynn Fishkin Kiley replacing Michael A. Thomas as counsel on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Kiley, Stephanie) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Brief
Tue 12/05 8:27 PM
OPENING BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci. (Borsos, John) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Administrative Appeal Scheduling Order
Thu 11/02 1:02 PM
AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Opening Brief due: December 5, 2017. Commissioner's Responsive Brief due: January 4, 2018. Plaintiffs Reply Brief (if any) due: January 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/2/2017. (las) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 11/01 1:45 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Opening Brief filed by Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci.(Borsos, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for extension of time | ||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Administrative Appeal Scheduling Order
Mon 10/23 10:12 AM
AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Opening Brief due: November 6, 2017. Commissioner's Responsive Brief due: December 6, 2017. Plaintiffs Reply Brief (if any) due: December 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/23/2017. (las) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 10/20 3:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time OPENING filed by Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci.(Borsos, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order | ||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Administrative Appeal Scheduling Order
Wed 08/16 10:43 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Opening Brief due: October 23, 2017. Commissioner's Responsive Brief due: November 22, 2017. Plaintiffs Reply Brief (if any) due: December 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/16/2017. (las) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/15 2:05 PM
MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci.(Borsos, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling order | ||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/14 12:21 PM
JOINT STATEMENT OF PARTIES/ CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci.(las) |
|
Att: 1 Consent | ||
12 | 12
misc
Received Consent /Reassignment Form
Mon 08/14 12:20 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci. (las) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Received Consent /Reassignment Form
Mon 08/14 12:08 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (las) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment
Fri 08/11 10:29 AM
NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use[LINK:the form on this link] or use the included form for non-efilers and send it to consents@utd.uscourts.gov within 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci. Form due by 8/28/2017. (las) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
SSA Administrative Record
Thu 08/10 3:31 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD received from Social Security Administration filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Berndt, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, | ||
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 6 Disability Related Development Part 1, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development Part 2, | ||
Att: 8 Disability Related Development Part 3, | ||
Att: 9 Disability Related Development Part 4, | ||
Att: 10 Disability Related Development Part 5, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 16 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 17 Medical Records Part 7 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/10 3:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. Attorney Amanda A. Berndt added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft)(Berndt, Amanda) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/10 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Thomas on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Thomas, Michael) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 06/12 12:18 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (jwt) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 06/12 12:18 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (jwt) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 06/12 12:17 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (jwt) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/08 11:32 AM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Originally received by the court on 5/4/17). (Fee Status: IFP) (Electronic document provided on disc.) filed by Griffin William Bonacci. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (dla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet 1 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 05/08 11:30 AM
ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/8/17. (dla) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 05/04 1:54 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Griffin William Bonacci. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (jwt) |