Smiley v. Brown et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney W Sippel |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01489 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 07, 2017 3:49 AM CST |
Defendant
B&W Cartage Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Terry Wayne Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Smiley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Wed 02/14 10:51 AM
ORDER re Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice26 . SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/14/18. (ARL) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Tue 02/13 3:27 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Plaintiff Charles Smiley. (Buckley, C.) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Case Management Order - Amended
Tue 10/31 10:08 AM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint motion to amend the case management order24 is granted only as follows, and the following schedule shall apply in this case and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: Discovery Completion due by 5/4/2018., ADR Future Reference 2/15/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 5/4/2018., Jury Trial set for 11/13/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (See Amended CMO for all details.) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/31/17. (ARL) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 10/30 2:55 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Reschedule Trial Date by Plaintiff Charles Smiley. (Buckley, C.) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Wed 09/27 10:20 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Defendants B&W Cartage Company, Inc., Terry Wayne Brown. (O'Keefe, Donald) filed by Terry Wayne Brown, B&W Cartage Company, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED.( ADR Completion Deadline due by 11/15/2017., ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 11/29/2017.). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/27/17. (LGK) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Mediation
Tue 09/26 8:51 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Defendants B&W Cartage Company, Inc., Terry Wayne Brown. (O'Keefe, Donald) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
adr
Notice of Appointment of Neutral
Mon 08/21 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Prebil, Thomas J. Neutral selected by the parties. Copy e-mailed to Thomas J. Prebil.(CAR) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
adr
Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report
Fri 08/18 2:44 PM
Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Charles Smiley Neutral: Prebil, Thomas J. Date of Conference: September 27, 2017 time: 9:30 a.m. Location: Other: 500 N. Broadway, St. Louis, MO(Buckley, C.) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Disclosure
Fri 07/14 3:01 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: C. Robert Buckley. ADR Completion Deadline due by 10/1/2017. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 10/16/2017. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 8/21/2017. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/1/17. (CAR) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Case Management Order
Wed 06/21 1:42 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Motion to Join Parties due by 8/1/2017. Discovery Completion due by 2/9/2018. ADR Future Reference 10/2/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 2/9/2018. Jury Trial set for 7/9/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/21/17. (ARL) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Continue
Tue 06/20 11:37 AM
MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff Charles Smiley. (Vuylsteke, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
A Docket Text Order
Fri 06/16 9:03 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice C Robert Buckley, filed by Charles Smiley; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/16/17. (CAR) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Scheduling Plan
Thu 06/15 10:56 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants B&W Cartage Company, Inc., Terry Wayne Brown. . (O'Keefe, Donald) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/15 10:23 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice C Robert Buckley. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6003922) by Plaintiff Charles Smiley.(Buckley, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Entry of Appearance
Tue 06/06 2:07 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kenneth K. Vuylsteke for Plaintiff Charles Smiley. (Vuylsteke, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Rule 16 Order
Tue 05/23 11:42 AM
RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: PTRACK 2 - STANDARD Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/15/2017. Rule 16 Conference set for 6/22/2017 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/23/17. (LGK) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/17 9:09 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Terry Wayne Brown.(O'Keefe, Donald) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/17 9:06 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by B&W Cartage Company, Inc..(O'Keefe, Donald) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/16 3:41 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Show Cause Order dated May 12, 2017 is deemed satisfied.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/16/17. (LGK) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Mon 05/15 10:23 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL re7 Order to Show Cause,, Supplement to Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal by Defendants B&W Cartage Company, Inc., Terry Wayne Brown.(O'Keefe, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Stipulation as to Amount in Controversy | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 05/12 11:08 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants shall show cause in writing no later than May 18, 2017, why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by supplementing its Notice of Removal as set out above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff may file any opposition to defendants Notice of Removal and/or a motion to remand or clarifying stipulation no later than May 19, 2017. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/12/2017. (Show Cause Response due by 5/18/2017.)(GGB) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Thu 05/11 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants B&W Cartage Company, Inc., Terry Wayne Brown Sent To: State Court - Executed (O'Keefe, Donald) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Letter PHV
Thu 05/11 11:50 AM
Letter to attorney C. Robert Buckley from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY
Thu 05/11 11:50 AM
Petition Received From: Warren County Circuit Court, filed by Charles Smiley.(JWD) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Thu 05/11 11:15 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant B&W Cartage Company, Inc... (O'Keefe, Donald) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Thu 05/11 11:13 AM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants B&W Cartage Company, Inc., Terry Wayne Brown Sent To: Plaintiff (O'Keefe, Donald) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal Petition
Thu 05/11 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren County, case number 16BB-CC00094, with receipt number 0865-5950152, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by B&W Cartage Company, Inc., Terry Wayne Brown.(O'Keefe, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court File, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Original Filing Form | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Thu 05/11 11:51 AM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD) |