Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:16-bk-25093

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John K Olson
Case #: 0:17-ap-01214
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 26, 2017
Terminated:Jan 18, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fusion Homes LLC
1200 S Pine Island Rd
Plantation, FL 33324
Represented By
Fusion Homes LLC
contact info
Defendant
Brenda D. Forman, Clerk of Circuit Court Broward County Florida
201 SE 6th Street
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Brenda D. Forman, Clerk of Circuit Court Broward County Florida
contact info
Defendant
Stok Folk + Kon, P.A.
18851 NE 29th Avenue, Suite 1005
Aventura, FL 33180
Represented By
Stok Folk + Kon, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
The Alessi Family Limited Partnership
407 Bonnie Brae Way
Hollywood, FL 33021
Represented By
Brian S Behar, Esq
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, January 18, 2018
45 45 court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/18 3:34 PM
Adversary Case 0:17-ap-1214 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Romero, Christina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
44 44 notice Notice of Filing Wed 12/06 5:14 PM
Notice of Filing (Accounting , Filed by Defendant Brenda D. Forman, Clerk of Circuit Court Broward County Florida (Re:42 Order Granting Motion For Summary Judgment (Re:14 )). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payment History Report)(O'Sheehan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 02, 2017
43 43 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/03 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 12/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 42 Order Granting Motion For Summary Judgment (Re:14 )
Thursday, November 30, 2017
42 42 order Summary Judgment Order Thu 11/30 9:31 AM
Order Granting Motion For Summary Judgment Related [+] (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-] #14
Thursday, November 23, 2017
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 11/24 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Order Cancelling Pre-trial Conference set November 29, 2017 Re: (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership).
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
40 40 court Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Tue 11/21 10:43 AM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Pre-trial Conference Hearing Related [+] (Romero, Christina)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01214 Complaint by The Alessi Family Limited Partnership against Fusion Homes LLC, Brenda D. Forman, Clerk of Circuit Court Broward County Florida, Stok Folk + Kon, P.A.. Nature of Suit:,(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),39 Order Cancelling Pre-trial Conference set November 29, 2017 Re: (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership).
39 39 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 11/21 10:42 AM
Order Cancelling Pre-trial Conference set November 29, 2017 Re: Related [+]. (Romero, Christina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership
Monday, October 02, 2017
38 38 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 10/02 9:47 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Brian S Behar Esq Related [+]. (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Motion to Extend Time
37 37 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 10/02 9:33 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Brian S Behar Esq Related [+]. (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-] 34 Order Continuing Hearing
Sunday, October 01, 2017
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 10/02 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Order Continuing Hearing On (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership). Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2017 at 09:30 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL.
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 10/02 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (Re:27 )
Friday, September 29, 2017
34 34 2 pgs order Order Continuing Hearing Fri 09/29 1:37 PM
Order Continuing Hearing On Related [+]. Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2017 at 09:30 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership
33 33 order Extend Time Order Fri 09/29 1:35 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-] #27
Friday, September 22, 2017
32 32 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Fri 09/22 3:53 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Brian S Behar Esq Related [+]. (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-] 31 Notice of Hearing
31 31 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 09/22 2:44 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2017 at 09:30 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Romero, Christina)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Extend Time to Plaintiff to File Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership (Attachments: # 1 service list)
Tuesday, September 19, 2017
30 30 answer Consent Tue 09/19 10:51 AM
Consent to (29 Motion to Extend Time to Parties to Complete Discovery, and File Joint Stipulation of Facts filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership) Filed by Defendant Fusion Homes LLC (Scott, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2017
29 29 motion Extend Time Mon 09/18 4:11 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Parties to Complete Discovery, and File Joint Stipulation of Facts Filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 service list
28 28 answer Reply Mon 09/18 2:17 PM
Reply to (26 Reply filed by Defendant Stok Folk + Kon, P.A.) Filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2017
27 27 motion Extend Time Thu 09/14 11:25 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Plaintiff to File Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 service list
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
26 26 answer Reply Tue 09/12 4:05 PM
Reply to (24 Response filed by Defendant Fusion Homes LLC) in Opposition to Debtor's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant Stok Folk + Kon, P.A. (Stok, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
25 25 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Wed 09/06 11:34 AM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Expert Witness Disclosure Filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership. (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 service list
Thursday, August 31, 2017
24 24 answer Response Thu 08/31 11:55 PM
Response to (14 Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership) Filed by Defendant Fusion Homes LLC (Scott, Patrick)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Thu 08/31 11:07 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Defendant Fusion Homes LLC. (Scott, Patrick)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Thu 08/31 3:42 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Defendant Stok Folk + Kon, P.A.. (Stok, Robert)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Thu 08/31 2:28 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership. (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 service list
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 08/31 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 08/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (Re:18 )
Monday, August 28, 2017
19 19 order Extend Time Order Mon 08/28 9:11 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-] #18
Thursday, August 24, 2017
18 18 motion Extend Time Thu 08/24 11:48 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant Fusion Homes LLC (Scott, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 06, 2017
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 08/07 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 08/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Setting Briefing Schedule on (Re:14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership).
Friday, August 04, 2017
16 16 answer Response Fri 08/04 10:18 AM
Response to (14 Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership) Filed by Defendant Stok Folk + Kon, P.A. (Stok, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order (Generic) Fri 08/04 9:35 AM
Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Related [+]. (Banoovong, Bea)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership
Monday, July 31, 2017
14 14 motion Summary Judgment Mon 07/31 2:38 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/18 1:45 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Stok Folk + Kon, P.A.. (Stok, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/14 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Re:5 )
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/11 12:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Stok Folk + Kon, P.A. Related [+]. (Stok, Robert)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
10 10 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Order Tue 07/11 9:38 AM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-] #5
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/28 3:36 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Fusion Homes LLC. (Scott, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/27 5:50 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Brenda D. Forman, Clerk of Circuit Court Broward County Florida. (O'Sheehan, Edward)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 06/27 12:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Edward J O'Sheehan Filed by Defendant Brenda D. Forman, Clerk of Circuit Court Broward County Florida. (O'Sheehan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2017
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Fri 06/23 2:58 PM
Notice of Filing , Filed by Defendant Stok Folk + Kon, P.A.. (Stok, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
5 5 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/21 4:47 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership Filed by Defendant Stok Folk + Kon, P.A. (Stok, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 05/30 5:12 PM
Summons Service Executed on Brenda D. Forman, Clerk of Circuit Court Broward County Florida 5/30/2017; Fusion Homes LLC 5/30/2017; Stok Folk + Kon, P.A. 5/30/2017 Filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership, Defendants Brenda D. Forman, Clerk of Circuit Court Broward County Florida, Fusion Homes LLC, Stok Folk + Kon, P.A.. (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Tue 05/30 2:56 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Ramos-White, Madeline)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 05/30 2:55 PM
Summons Issued on Brenda D. Forman, Clerk of Circuit Court Broward County Florida Answer Due 6/29/2017; Fusion Homes LLC Answer Due 6/29/2017; Stok Folk + Kon, P.A. Answer Due 6/29/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 09/27/2017 at 09:30 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Ramos-White, Madeline)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Alessi Family Limited Partnership
Friday, May 26, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/26 10:02 AM
Adversary case 17-01214 Complaint by The Alessi Family Limited Partnership against Fusion Homes LLC, Brenda D. Forman, Clerk of Circuit Court Broward County Florida, Stok Folk + Kon, P.A.. Nature of Suit:,(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]