Ignite Restaurant Group, Inc. and Jeffrey Ivey
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher M Lopez |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-33550 |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Ignite Restaurant Group, Inc.
Alvarez & Marshal North America, LLC c/o Jonathan Tibus Monarch Tower 3424 Peachtree Road, Suite 1500
Atlanta, GA 30326 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
BHTT Entertainment, LLC
10555 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042-5021 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Brick House Development, LLC
10555 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042-5021 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Ignite Restaurant Group - RSC LLC
10555 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042-5021 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Ignite Restaurants - New Jersey, LLC
10555 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042-5021 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
JCS Development, LLC
10555 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042-5021 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
JCS Monmouth Mall - NJ, LLC
10555 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042-5021 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Joe's Crab Shack - Anne Arundel MD, LLC
10555 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042-5021 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Joe's Crab Shack - Maryland, LLC
10555 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042-5021 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Joe's Crab Shack - Redondo Beach, Inc.
10555 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042-5021 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Joe's Crab Shack, LLC
10555 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042-5021 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 11:38 AM CST |
Attorney
KING & SPALDING LLP
1100 Louisiana Suite 4000
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Law Firm of Russell R. Johnson, III, PLC
2258 Wheatlands Dr.
Manakin-Sabot, VA 23103 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Law Offices of Sussman & Moore, LLP
4645 N. Central Expressway Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City Of McAllen
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Credit Suisse AG, Cayman Islands Branch
Porter Hedges LLP 1000 Main Street, 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
c/o beth Weller Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Galveston County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hidalgo County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KGGK Venture, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KIR Latham Farms, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lewisville ISD
Linbarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lubbock Central Appraisal District
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott PO Box 817
Lubbock, TX 79408 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nueces County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
225 West Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Spirit Master Funding, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tarrant county
Linebarger Goggan Balir & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Kimberly A. Walsh P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
WRI Fiesta Trails, LP
2600 Citadel Plaza Dr., Suite 125 Attn: Jenny J. Hyun, Esq.
Houston, TX 77008 |
|
Creditor
12910 NW Freeway Realty, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
212 College Street LTD C/O LAW OFFICES OF RONALD J. JOHNSON
LAW OFFICES OF RONALD J. JOHNSON 111 Soledad Suite 1350
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
3503 RP Cedar Hill Pleasant Run Limited Partnership f/n/a Inland Western Cedar Pleasant Run Limited Partnership
Martin & Drought, P.C. 300 Convent Street Suite 2500
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
7510 Hazard, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
8250 Dean Road, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
8400 I-Drive, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Electric Power
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arizona Department Of Revenue
2005 North Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004 |
|
Creditor
Martha and Charlie Armstrong
P.O. Box 671309
Dallas, TX 75367 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
BRE RC Deptford NJ LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BRE RC Riverpark SC TX, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Baltimore Gas and Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Banc of America Credit Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bexar County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brazoria County Municipal Utility District #6
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brazoria County Tax Office
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brazoria County Tax Office, Brazoria County Municipal Utility District No. 6, Humble independent School District, Spring Independent School District, Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 189,
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Broadhurst Theatre, LLC
1401 McKinney, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CFF Joe's Crab Shack, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
California Wage/ Hour
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chatham County Tax Commissioner
PO Box 8324
Savannah, GA 31412 |
|
Creditor
City of Bellevue, Kentucky
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Sacramento
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Savannah
P.O. BOX 1228
Savannah, GA 31402 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Clant, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Class Proof of General Unsecured and Priority Claimants
Patricia B. Tomasco c/o Jackson Walker L.L.P. 1401 McKinney, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Clifton Lifestyle Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Constanza Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
County of Orange
Orange County Counsel 333 W. Santa Ana Blvd., Suite 407 P.O. Box 1379
Santa Ana, CA 92702 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DDR Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Delmarva Power & Light Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Denton County, Williamson County
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Eastern Coastal Properties, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Eatontown Monmouth Mall Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ecolab Inc.
4650 North Port Washington Road
Milwaukee, WI 53212 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Doris Edwards
1040 SE 20th St
Gainsville, FL 32641 |
|
Creditor
Fair Lakes Crabhouse, LC
Snow Spence Green LLP 2929 Allen Parkway, Ste. 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Federal Realty Investment Trust, AFL CIO Building Investment Trust dba BIT Investment Twenty-Seven LLC and Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
1401 McKinney, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Federal Realty Investmenty Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Foothill Crossing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Forest City Realty Trust, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Forest City Station Square Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Four Aces, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GCS Service, Inc.
Wash. Bldg, Barnabas Bldg. 4650 N. Port Washington Rd.
Milwaukee, WI 53212 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gart Roosevelt Associates, LLC
Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Georgia Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rachel Grannan
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gulf Properties
15150 Middlebrook Dr.
Houston, TX 77058 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
HSC Willowbrook, LP
1776 Yorktown, Suite 425
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County Municipal Utility District #189
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Christopher Hart, as Class Representative
Jackson Walker LLP 1401 McKinney Street Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Humble Independent School District
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Robert W. Hutson as Trustee Under Trust #1001 June 20, 2000
2755 Pfingsten Road
Northbrook, IL 60062 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Illinois Department of Revenue
100 West Randolph Street Level 7-400
Chicago, IL 60601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Intram Investments, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
JMM Raceway, LLC
Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jefferson County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP 1148 Park Street
Beaumont, TX 77701 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jersey Central Power & Light Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jordan Commons LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KeySpan Gas East Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Todd Klingensmith
Matt Morrison P.O. Drawer 21387
Waco, TX 76702 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lawrence Investment Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Patrick Luckey
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cappie Mansfield
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mapleview Associates, Inc. an Oklahoma Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Martignetti Grocery Co. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Massachusetts Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mattone Group Elmhurst Co., LLC
Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mattone Management Group, LLC
Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mattone Raceway, LLC
Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Micromont Holdings 9, LLC
Spector & Johnson, PLLC 12770 Coit Road Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
NNN Vineyard Springs Apartments 30,LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NNN Vineyard Springs Apartments 31, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NNN Vineyard Springs Apartments 32, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NNN Vineyard Springs Apartments 33, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Realty & Development Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Navigators Specialty Insurance Company and certain other related entities
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Navillus Group, Inc.
Snow Spence Green LLP 2929 Allen Parkway, Ste. 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Net Star Telecommunications, Inc.
Sprouse Law Firm 401 Congress Avenue Suite 1540
Austin, TX 78701 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oklahoma County Treasurer
Tammy Jones 320 Robert S. Kerr Room 307
Oklahoma City, OK 73102 |
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St. 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Orange County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Orange and Rockland Utilities, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Park Family Trust
1885 Saint James Place 15th Floor
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pinellas County Tax Collector
Post Office Box 6340
Clearwater, FL 33758 |
|
Creditor
Public Service Electric and Gas Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pyramid Management Group, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Restaurant Row, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Robinson Station LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rochester Gas & Electric Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Joseph Rome
5090 Richmond Ave #472
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rorida LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rosebriar Stemmons, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rouse Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sacramento Municipal Utility District
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Salt River Project
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
San Diego County Treasurer-Tax Collector
1600 Pacific Highway, Room 162
San Diego, CA 92101 |
|
Creditor
San Diego Gas and Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Albert Shelton
Righetti Glugoski 456 Montgomery St Ste 1400
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
|
Creditor
Siegen Lane Properties LLC of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Southern California Edison Company
Sussman & Moore, LLP 4645 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 300
Dallas, TX 75205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Southern California Gas Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Spring Independent School District
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nikia L Stone
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TJS Joe's Crab Shack, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TM4 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TMT Point Plaza Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
PO Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The City of Bellevue, Kentucky
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
2455 Paces Ferry Road, C-9
Atlanta, GA 30339 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Potomac Electric Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thomas & Solomon, LLP, counsel for Christopher Hart and Lydarius Wiley
LUTTRELL + CARMODY LAW GROUP 100 N.E. Loop 410, Ste. 615
San Antonio, TX 78216 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
c/o Kay D. Brock Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tronis Roeding-Mitchell Family Properties LP
Jackson Walker LLP 1401 McKinney Street Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
URO Properties, LLC
811 Main Street Suite 1700
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
US Harmony, LLC
2603 August, Suite 1100
Houston, TX 77057 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
USRP Funding 2001-A, L.P.
1650 Farnam Street
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Virginia Electric and Power Company d/b/a Dominion Energy Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Washington Prime Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Washingtonian Associates, LC
Snow Spence Green LLP 2929 Allen Parkway, Ste. 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Keitia Winfield
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Your Speakeasy, LLC
Jennifer F. Wertz Jackson Walker LLP 100 Congress Avenue Suite 1100
Austin, TX 78701 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Houlihan's Restaurants, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
KRG Acquisition Co., LLC
Okin Adams LLP 1113 Vine St., Suite 201
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Landry's Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
2004 Park Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Crab Shack Acquisition FL, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Crab Shack Acquisition GA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Crab Shack Acquisition PA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Crab Shack Acquisition VA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Crab Shack Acquistion NJ, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Duquesne Light Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
JSC Acquisition, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Landry's MCGA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mark Robinson Trusts
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Kyle McCarrell
1712 E. Riverside 300
Austin, TX 78741 |
|
Interested Party
POG Arbed PH Dallas, LP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
State of New Jersey Dept of Law and Public Safety
Division of Alcoholic Beverage Control P O Box 087
Trenton, NJ 08625 |
|
Interested Party
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Garden City Group, LLC
1985 Marcus Avenue Suite 200
Lake Success, NY 11042 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Clark County Assessor
500 S. Grand Central Parkway
Las Vegas, NV 89155 |
|
Other Prof.
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
GUC Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Providence Risk & Insurance Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Mark A. Roberts, Trustee for the IRG Creditors Liquidation Trust
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC 655 15th Street N.W. Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Ivey
Kessler Collins, P.C. c/o Howard C. Rubin 2100 Ross Avenue, Ste. 750
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Stockholder
J.H. Whitney & Co.
700 Milam Street, Suite 2700
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Liquidation Trustee
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
1. | Ignite Restaurant Group, owner of Joe's Crab Shack, files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (bloomberg.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/07/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 5:31 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3467 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 5:31 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3475 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 5:32 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3520 Closed. (rgs4) |