Wallace v. Group Long Term Disability Pla
Original Case: 1:13-cv-06759
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01766 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 29, 2017 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of TDAmeritrade Holding Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
Pamela Wallace
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/29/2017 4:31 AM EDT |
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Wallace, FILED. [2050535] 17-1766 [Entered: 06/05/2017 12:36 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/15/2017, RECEIVED.[2050541] 17-1766 [Entered: 06/05/2017 12:39 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Wallace, district court receipt # 0208-13737887, FILED.[2050542] 17-1766 [Entered: 06/05/2017 12:40 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2050547] 17-1766 [Entered: 06/05/2017 12:41 PM] |