JL Windham v. Unknown M., et al
Original Case: 4:17-cv-01211
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02262 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 17, 2017 3:32 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Unknown M., Representative for A.L.I.V.E.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
ALIVESTL.ORG, Organization
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JL Windham, Dr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/17/2017 3:32 AM CDT |
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4544696] 17-2262 (AEV) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum and Order 5/18/17, Order of Dismisal 5/18/17, Returned Envelope 5/30/17, docket entries, [4544706] 17-2262 (AEV) | ||
CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 07/05/2017, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4544708] 17-2262 (AEV) |