Square One Tyrone, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 6:17-bk-03846
Lead case is: 6:17-bk-03846
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Karen S Jennemann |
Case #: | 6:17-bk-03853 |
Case Filed: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2020 |
Type | Other Entity Type |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Square One Tyrone, LLC
704 W Bay St
Tampa, FL 33606-2706 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago |
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 02/14 8:59 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Dianna) |
||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Wed 01/22 1:05 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case . Service Instructions: R Shuker is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Mary H.) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
court
COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
Mon 09/09 10:36 AM
Change of Law Firm and Address submitted to the Court on September 6, 2019 by Attorney R. Scott Shuker who was formerly associated with Latham Shuker Eden & Beaudine LLP and is now associated with Shuker & Dorris, P.A. - 121 South Orange Avenue - Orlando, FL 32801. (Sara M.) |
||
court
COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
Mon 09/09 1:09 PM
Change of Law Firm Name submitted to the Court on September 9, 2019 by Attorney Daniel A Velasquez who was formerly associated with Latham, Shuker, Eden & Beaudine, LLP and is now associated with Latham, Luna, Eden & Beaudine, LLP. (Sara M.) |
||
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
court
COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
Thu 06/28 8:48 AM
Change of Address submitted to the Court on June 27, 2018 by Attorney Michael C. Markham of Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP - 401 East Jackson Street, Suite 3100 - Tampa, FL 33602. (Sara M.) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
court
(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases
Thu 06/22 10:17 AM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case. All papers should be docketed in Case No. 6:17-bk-03846-KSJ An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of In Re Square One Development, LLC; Square One Winter Park, LLC; Square One Tamiami, LLC; Square One University, LLC; Square One Ft. Myers, LLC; Square One Tampa Bay, LLC; Square One Henderson, LLC; Square One Brandon, LLC; Square One Tyrone, LLC; Square One The Villages, LLC; Square One Gainesville, LLC; Square One Burgers Prop Co., LLC; Square One Lakeland, LLC; The Docket in Case No.: 6:17-bk-03846-KSJ should be consulted for all matters affecting the consolidated cases. . (Adrienne) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Proof of Service
Tue 06/20 9:58 AM
Proof of Service of Order Directing Joint Administration of Cases and First Interim Order on Use of Cash Collateral. Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Square One Tyrone, LLC . (Shuker, R) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Use Cash Collateral
Mon 06/19 8:55 AM
First Interim Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral and Notice of Continued Hearing July 17, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. . Service Instructions: R Shuker is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Adrienne) Modified on 6/19/2017 (Adrienne) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Joint Administration
Fri 06/16 1:20 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration . This case is associated with lead case 6:17-bk-3846. . Service Instructions: R Shuker is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Karla) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 06/16 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 06/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
trustee
Notice Of Rescheduled Section 341 Meeting
Thu 06/15 2:41 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Section 341 Meeting of Creditors. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/17/2017 at 09:00 AM at Orlando, FL (687) Suite 1203B, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 West Washington Street. (Aleskovsky, Audrey) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
Exhibit List - Annotated
Tue 06/20 3:00 PM
Annotated Exhibit List of Square One Tyrone from Hearing Held on 6/14/17 . (Stephanie V.) |
|
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Thu 06/15 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 06/14/2017. (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 06/15 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 06/14/2017. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Exhibit
Wed 06/14 12:21 PM
Proposed Exhibits ranging from 1 to 1. 2 documents attached filed on behalf of Square One Tyrone, LLC. 6-Week Budget . (ADIclerk) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 06/14 10:02 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sacha Ross on behalf of Creditor Stearns Bank, N.A.. (Ross, Sacha) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 06/13 6:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Creditor First Citrus Bank. (Markham, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate Of Necessity
Tue 06/13 3:49 PM
Certificate of Necessity re Emergency Motion Authorizing the Maintenance of Debtor's Bank Accounts. Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor Square One Tyrone, LLC . (Velasquez, Daniel) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event)
Tue 06/13 3:18 PM
Emergency Motion Authorizing the Maintenance of Debtor's Bank Accounts Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor Square One Tyrone, LLC (Velasquez, Daniel) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings)
Tue 06/13 11:11 AM
Notice of Appearance for Purposes of CM/ECF Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Aleskovsky, Audrey) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Mon 06/12 9:16 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Of Necessity
Mon 06/12 3:36 PM
Certificate of Necessity and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Square One Tyrone, LLC . (Shuker, R) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Motion for Joint Administration
Mon 06/12 2:22 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 6:17-bk-03846-KSJ with 6:17-bk-03843-KSJ; 6:17-bk-03847-KSJ; 6:17-bk-03848-KSJ; 6:17-bk-03849-KSJ; 6:17-bk-03850-KSJ; 6:17-bk-03851-KSJ; 6:17-bk-03852-KSJ; 6:17-bk-03853-KSJ; 6:17-bk-03855-KSJ; 6:17-bk-03856-KSJ; 6:17-bk-03857-KSJ; and 6:17-bk-03858-KSJ Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Square One Tyrone, LLC (Shuker, R) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Mon 06/12 12:32 PM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Request for Emergency Preliminary Hearing. Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Square One Tyrone, LLC (Shuker, R) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Mon 06/12 12:10 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Daniel A Velasquez on behalf of Debtor Square One Tyrone, LLC. (Velasquez, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
court
Notice Of Deficient Filing
Mon 06/12 11:01 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. summary of assets, schedules A-B,D-H, declaration concerning schedules, statement of financial affairs, disclosure of compensation, case managment summary not filed . (Kerry) |
|
3 | 3
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Mon 06/12 11:00 AM
Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/10/2017 at 09:00 AM at Orlando, FL (687) Suite 1203B, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 West Washington Street. Proofs of Claims due by 9/25/2017. (Kerry) |
|
assign
Assign Judge to Electronically Filed Cases
Mon 06/12 9:15 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Karen S. Jennemann, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Heather L.) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Fri 06/09 6:11 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Square One Tyrone, LLC. (Shuker, R) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 06/09 6:10 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Verification of Creditor Matrix, and Matrix. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Square One Tyrone, LLC. (Shuker, R) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Fri 06/09 6:30 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:17-bk-03853) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 53904957, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Fri 06/09 9:02 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |