Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11062

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brian F Kenney
Case #: 1:17-ap-01063
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
James Kim
7907 Harwood Place
Springfield, VA 22152
Represented By
James Kim
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael L. Newsom, Trustee
4846 Sun City Center Blvd., #255
Sun City Center, FL 33573
Represented By
Jonathan L. Gold
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
21 21 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 08/15 4:57 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
20 20 court Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled Mon 07/16 9:21 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled - Removed/Notce of Dismissal filed Related [+] (lawsont)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Michael L. Newsom, Trustee
Friday, July 13, 2018
19 19 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 07/13 10:00 AM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Jonathan L. Gold of Michael Best & Friedrich LLP on behalf of Michael L. Newsom, Trustee. (Gold, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
18 18 court Hearing continued Mon 05/14 9:27 AM
Hearing continued; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 S Washington St, 2nd Flr, Courtroom I, Alexandria, VA. (lawsont)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Michael L. Newsom, Trustee
Monday, March 12, 2018
17 17 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Mon 03/12 9:44 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued; Related [+] Appearance: Jonathan L. Gold Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/14/2018 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 S Washington St, 2nd Flr, Courtroom I, Alexandria, VA, (lawsont)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Michael L. Newsom, Trustee
Monday, January 08, 2018
16 16 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Mon 01/08 10:28 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued; Related [+] Appearance: Jonathan L. Gold Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/12/2018 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 S Washington St, 2nd Flr, Courtroom I, Alexandria, VA, (lawsont)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Michael L. Newsom, Trustee
Saturday, November 11, 2017
15 15 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sun 11/12 12:27 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Order Re: Show Cause
Thursday, November 09, 2017
14 14 order Re: Show Cause Thu 11/09 3:44 PM
Order Dismissing Show Cause Related [+] (Douglass, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Order to Show Cause, Set For
Monday, November 06, 2017
13 13 court Hearing held Mon 11/06 10:23 AM
Hearing held;Show Case Dismissed;Court To Prepare Order Related [+] Appearance : Jonathan L. Gold Order/Disposition due by 11/20/2017. (chandlerkj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Mon 11/06 10:24 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued; Related [+] Appearance : Jonathan L. Gold Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/08/2018 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 South Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA (chandlerkj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Sunday, November 05, 2017
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing Sun 11/05 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Entry of Default
Friday, November 03, 2017
11 11 court Entry of Default Fri 11/03 1:57 PM
Entry of Default against James Kim a/k/a/ Byong Kim Related [+] (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Michael L. Newsom, Trustee
Thursday, November 02, 2017
10 10 answer Answer Thu 11/02 3:22 PM
Answer to Court's Order to Show Cause Why Adversary Proceeding Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution Related [+] filed by Jonathan L. Gold of Michael Best & Friedrich LLP on behalf of Michael L. Newsom, Trustee. (Gold, Jonathan)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Order to Show Cause, Set For
9 9 motion Entry of Default Thu 11/02 12:31 PM
Motion for Entry of Default filed by Jonathan L. Gold of Michael Best & Friedrich LLP on behalf of Michael L. Newsom, Trustee. (Gold, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Declaration
Sunday, October 22, 2017
8 8 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 10/23 12:20 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Order to Show Cause, Set For
Friday, October 20, 2017
7 7 order To Show Cause, Set For Fri 10/20 1:32 PM
Order to Show Cause, Set For Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/6/2017 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 South Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Michael L. Newsom, Trustee
Monday, October 16, 2017
6 6 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Mon 10/16 11:00 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued; Show Cause to be issued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/06/2017 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 South Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA (lawsont)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/28 3:41 PM
Certificate of Service James Kim a/k/a Byong Kim, Serve: James Kim Related [+] filed by Allen Mahlon DeBard of LeClairRyan, A Professional Corporation on behalf of Michael L. Newsom, Trustee. (DeBard, Allen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Michael L. Newsom, Trustee,3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference,4 Initial Scheduling Order
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
4 4 order Initial Scheduling Order Wed 06/21 2:40 PM
Initial Scheduling Order (Shepherd, Anthony)
Related: [-]
3 3 summon Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 06/21 2:39 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to James Kim Answer Due 7/21/2017 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kenney's Courtroom, 200 South Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA, (Shepherd, Anthony)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Michael L. Newsom, Trustee
Friday, June 16, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 06/16 12:44 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-01063 BFK) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26439210, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 06/16 12:25 PM
Adversary case 17-01063 Complaint against James Kim filed by Michael L. Newsom, Trustee. Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 1:14-bk-11062 (Gold, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A