Sims-King v. Washington University et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Ross |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01785 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2017 3:00 AM CST |
Defendant
Legail Chandler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-10
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lorraine Goffe-Rush
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Linda Hack
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Washington University
660 South Euclid Campus Box 8037
St. Louis, MO 63110 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marla Aliece Sims-King
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago |
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Wed 11/30 3:51 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to continue the sealing of documents in this case is DENIED as moot. (Doc.26 ). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/30/2022. (CLT) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Continued Sealing
Tue 11/29 9:39 PM
MOTION for Continued Sealing by Defendants WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS EXECUTIVE VICE CHANCELLOR AND CHIEF ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICER, WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS PLAN ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE, WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS RETIREMENT PLAN ADVISORY COMMITTEE, Washington University in St. Louis, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-01641-RLW, 4:17-cv-01785-JAR(Russell, Matthew) |
|
Monday, June 15, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Mon 06/15 1:53 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall amend their complaint to omit Counts II, III, and IV, and the facts associated with those Counts, and file the same by July 6, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall serve their answer within twenty-one (21) days after the filing of Plaintiffs' amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on June 15, 2020. [Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-01641-RLW, 4:17-cv-01785-JAR](BRP) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment - (Case)
Fri 09/28 3:08 PM
JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (ECF No. 34) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on September 28, 2018. (BRP) |
|
23 | 23
10
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Fri 09/28 3:02 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (ECF No. 34) is GRANTED. An appropriate Judgment is filed herewith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on September 28, 2018. (BRP) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
A Docket Text Order
Tue 09/19 10:20 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael McKay. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6150296) by Plaintiff Marla Aliece Sims-King.(McKay, Michael) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/19/2017. (CLO) |
|
21 | 21
order
A Docket Text Order
Tue 09/19 10:20 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John J. Nestico. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6150284) by Plaintiff Marla Aliece Sims-King.(Nestico, John) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/19/2017. (CLO) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/18 6:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael McKay. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6150296) by Plaintiff Marla Aliece Sims-King.(McKay, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
19 | 19
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/18 5:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John J. Nestico. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6150284) by Plaintiff Marla Aliece Sims-King.(Nestico, John) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 09/14 10:00 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Garrett W. Wotkyns. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6144765) by Plaintiff Marla Aliece Sims-King.(Wotkyns, Garrett) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/14/2017. (CLO) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/13 5:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Garrett W. Wotkyns. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6144765) by Plaintiff Marla Aliece Sims-King.(Wotkyns, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 08/31 11:46 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian T. Ortelere. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6107992) by Defendants Washington University in St. Louis, Legail Chandler, Does 1-10, Lorraine Goffe-Rush, Linda Hack, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees.15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeremy P. Blumenfeld. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6124660) by Defendants Washington University in St. Louis, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/31/2017. (CLO) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/30 4:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeremy P. Blumenfeld. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6124660) by Defendants Washington University in St. Louis, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees.Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-01641-RLW, 4:17-cv-01785-JAR(Blumenfeld, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/21 10:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Washington University in St. Louis, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees Amendment to (1 in 4:17-cv-01641-RLW) Complaint Jury demand, , filed by Latasha Davis, Jennifer Elliott, Marla Aliece Sims-King. Related document: (1 in 4:17-cv-01641-RLW) Complaint filed by Latasha Davis.Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-01641-RLW, 4:17-cv-01785-JAR(Edgar, John) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/18 5:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian T. Ortelere. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6107992) by Defendants Washington University in St. Louis, Legail Chandler, Does 1-10, Lorraine Goffe-Rush, Linda Hack, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees.Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-01641-RLW, 4:17-cv-01785-JAR(Ortelere, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Brian T. Ortelere | ||
12 | 12
order
A Docket Text Order
Fri 08/18 9:59 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Deborah S. Davidson. by Defendants Legail Chandler, Does 1-10, Lorraine Goffe-Rush, Linda Hack, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees. (Davidson, Deborah)11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew A. Russell. by Defendants Legail Chandler, Does 1-10, Lorraine Goffe-Rush, Linda Hack, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees. (Russell, Matthew) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/18/2017. (CLO) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/17 11:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew A. Russell. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6104287) by Defendants Legail Chandler, Does 1-10, Lorraine Goffe-Rush, Linda Hack, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees.(Russell, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Matthew A. Russell | ||
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/17 11:04 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Deborah S. Davidson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6104117) by Defendants Legail Chandler, Does 1-10, Lorraine Goffe-Rush, Linda Hack, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees.(Davidson, Deborah) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Deborah S. Davidson | ||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) ~Util - Create Case Association
Mon 07/24 3:59 PM
ORDER...Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 43(a) is GRANTED in its entirety, Cases associated. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/24/2017. (NEB) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Filing Motion to Consolidate
Fri 07/21 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Plaintiff Marla Aliece Sims-King with case number 4:17-cv-01641-RLW(Rosemergy, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Davis Motion to Consolidate | ||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
A Docket Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/14 11:19 AM
Docket Text ORDER: as to Legail Chandler, Lorraine Goffe-Rush, Linda Hack, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees Re:5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (Unopposed Motion for Extension) by Defendants Legail Chandler, Lorraine Goffe-Rush, Linda Hack, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees.(Smith, Christopher) ; ORDERED GRANTED, Legail Chandler answer due 9/25/2017; Lorraine Goffe-Rush answer due 9/25/2017; Linda Hack answer due 9/25/2017; Washington University answer due 9/25/2017; Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees answer due 9/25/2017. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/14/17. (JAB) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Thu 07/13 5:22 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Washington University. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: BioSTL; BJC Institute of Health at Washington University School of Medicine Condominium Association; C2N Diagnostics, LLC; Campus Integration South Condominium Association; Center of Research, Technology and Entrepreneurial Expertise; Consortium for Graduate Studies in Management; DVA/Washington University Healthcare Services of Greater St. Louis, L.L.C.; Eastgate ML, LLC; Eastgate MT, LLC; Exegy, Inc. (f/k/a Data Search Systems, Inc.); Forest West Properties, Inc.; IITB-WUSTL Research and Educational Academy; International Pediatric Nutrition Alliance; Kingman Redevelopment Corp.; McPherson Master Tenant, LLC; Midwest Lithotripsy, LLC; Midwest Surgical Technologies, LLC; Molecular Biology Consortium; NDFY14 Master Tenant, LLC; North Delmar FY14, LLC; Pinnacle Consortium of Higher Education; SKDB FY14, LLC; SKDB MT, LLC; St. Louis Internet2 Access Consortium, LLC; St. Louis Land Company, L.L.C.; Telecommunications Facilities Corp.; The Childrens Discovery Institute; The Heart Care Institute Affiliated Services, LLC; The Heart Care Institute, L.L.C.; University Reciprocal Manager, L.L.C.; VelociData, Inc.; Washington University Medical Center; Washington University Medical Center Redevelopment Corp.; Washington University Physician Network, Inc.; William Greenleaf Eliot Seed Fund, LLC, Publicly held company: None,. (Smith, Christopher) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/13 5:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (Unopposed Motion for Extension) by Defendants Legail Chandler, Lorraine Goffe-Rush, Linda Hack, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees.(Smith, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/13 5:18 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher A. Smith for Defendants Legail Chandler, Lorraine Goffe-Rush, Linda Hack, Washington University, Washington University in St. Louis Board of Trustees. (Smith, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/29 1:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Marla Aliece Sims-King. Washington University served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. (Rosemergy, James) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Notice of Process Server
Fri 06/23 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Marla Aliece Sims-King Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc. (Rosemergy, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/23 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6017987, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Marla Sims-King.(Rosemergy, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Fri 06/23 3:24 PM
Case Opening Notification: 5 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney James J. Rosemergy. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK) |