ISCOM NY, LLC and Craig Jalbert, as Liquidating Trust for the Liquid
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11906
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11906
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11907 |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
ISCOM NY, LLC
1 York St
New York, NY 10013-2123 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago |
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
order
Order RE: Application, Final Decree
Thu 08/17 11:44 AM
Order and Final Decree signed on 8/17/2023 closing the chapter 11 case, authorizing the extension of the trust through December 31, 2026 and granting related relief . (See documents 770 and 782 in lead case 17-11906 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 08/17 12:02 PM
Case Closed. (Ho, Amanda) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Application, Final Decree
Tue 07/11 1:48 PM
Application for Final Decree with Notice of Presentment. See Lead Case No. 17-11906 (MEW) BICOM NY, LLC, et al. and Craig Jalbert, as Liquidating Trust for the Liquid Document No. 770 filed by Alan E. Gamza on behalf of Craig Jalbert, as Liquidating Trust for the Liquidation Trust Responses due by 7/26/2023, with presentment to be held on 8/2/2023 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW). (Ho, Amanda) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Operating Report
Fri 08/16 1:22 PM
Operating Report ISCOM monthly report for May 2019 Filed by Eric J. Snyder on behalf of ISCOM NY, LLC. (Snyder, Eric) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Thu 06/28 2:12 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, JND Corporate Restructuring Claims Agent, added to the case. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Amended Schedules
Fri 12/01 1:30 PM
Amended Schedules filed:, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual Filed by Eric J. Snyder on behalf of ISCOM NY, LLC. (Snyder, Eric) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 12/01 1:34 PM
Receipt of Amended Schedules 17-11907 mew) [misc,schaja] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12317606. Fee amount 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
claims
Claims Register (Final)
Thu 09/28 12:06 PM
First Claims Register Final filed by Peter J. Piergiovanni on behalf of Auto Design NYC. (Piergiovanni, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 09/06 12:53 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Eric S. Medina on behalf of Joseph DiVita. (Medina, Eric) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 08/11 4:09 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Eric J. Snyder on behalf of ISCOM NY, LLC. (Snyder, Eric) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Appearance
Thu 07/27 4:59 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Justin R. Bonanno on behalf of One York Property LLC. (Bonanno, Justin) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Motion, Relief from Stay (fee)
Thu 07/27 4:47 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Justin R. Bonanno on behalf of One York Property LLC with hearing to be held on 8/15/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Responses due by 8/8/2017,. (Bonanno, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Motion | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Affidavit | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit D | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit E | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 07/27 4:49 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (fee) 17-11907 mew) [motion,185] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11983055. Fee amount 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 07/18 10:56 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Virginia T. Shea on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Shea, Virginia) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 07/18 10:52 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Eric R. Perkins on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Perkins, Eric) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Appearance
Mon 07/17 5:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers filed by Donald W. Clarke on behalf of Zachary Schwebel. (Clarke, Donald) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Appearance
Mon 07/17 5:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers filed by Daniel M. Stolz on behalf of Zachary Schwebel. (Stolz, Daniel) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting
Sat 07/15 12:20 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors . Notice Date 07/14/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Thu 07/13 2:37 PM
Case Joint Administration with Lead Case No. 17-11906 (MEW)BICOM NY, LLC, et al. (Ho, Amanda) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Wed 07/12 2:57 PM
Order signed on 7/12/2017 granting Debtors' motion for joint administration of cases 17-11906 17-11907 and 17-11908 under 17-11906 (BICOM NY, LLC, et al) . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Wed 07/12 1:12 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Eloy A Peral on behalf of ISCOM NY, LLC. (Peral, Eloy) |
|
2 | 2
misc
341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC)
Wed 07/12 8:26 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/11/2017 at 02:30 PM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (Richards, Beverly) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
misc
Add Judge
Tue 07/11 8:41 AM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Harris, Kendra) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
40
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 07/10 6:13 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Eric J. Snyder of Wilk Auslander LLP on behalf of ISCOM NY, LLC. (Snyder, Eric) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 07/10 6:14 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11907 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11952461. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |