Lorilar Enterprises, Inc.
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stephen C St John |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-72640 |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Aug 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Lorilar Enterprises, Inc.
946 Oriole Dr
Virginia Beach, VA 23451-4956 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Judy A. Robbins
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 4 -N 200 Granby Street, Room 625
Norfolk, VA 23510 |
Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago |
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
court
Case Closed - Chapter 11 Dismissal
Fri 09/08 7:16 AM
Case Closed. The Chapter 11 case having been dismissed, the case is hereby closed and all pending adversary proceedings and motions are subject to the effects of dismissal pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 349. (Jones, Diane) |
|
Saturday, August 26, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Sun 08/27 12:28 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
35 | 35
3
pgs
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Dismissal
Sun 08/27 12:28 AM
Notice of Dismissal (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Fri 08/25 12:28 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Local Bankruptcy Rule Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/24 10:55 AM
Local Bankruptcy Rule Order Dismissing Case for Failure to File Lists, Schedules & Statements (Jones, Diane) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Application to Employ
Tue 08/22 3:58 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. as Debtor's Counsel (Daly, Sabrina) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
court
Failure to Prosecute Notice Request
Thu 08/17 2:14 PM
Notice of Failure to Prosecute Issued Failure to Prosecute Disposition due by 8/31/2017. (Jones, Diane) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/14 10:00 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Electronic Notices filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Sentara Healthcare, Sentara Medical Group, and OptimaHealth. (Speckhart, Cullen) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Fri 08/11 12:30 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Thu 08/10 12:23 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Lists Schedules and/or Statements
Tue 08/08 12:08 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Lists Schedules and/or Statements LBR 1007-1 Incomplete Filings due by 8/23/2017. (Jones, Diane) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/08 2:06 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Darryl S. Laddin of Arnall Golden Gregory LLP on behalf of Sysco Hampton Roads, Inc.. (Jones, Diane) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use)
Mon 08/07 2:44 PM
Notice of Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. on behalf of Lorilar Enterprises, Inc..(Crowley, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extend Time to File Lists Schedules and/or Statements
Mon 08/07 2:43 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Lists, Schedules and/or Statements filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. on behalf of Lorilar Enterprises, Inc.. (Crowley, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Authorize
Fri 08/04 5:34 PM
Order Granting Motion to Authorize Payment of Pre-Petition Wages (Atkins, Julie) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
Hearing held
Thu 08/03 11:26 AM
Hearing held; motion granted. Appearances : Karen M. Crowley, Nicholas S. Herron, Larry Seas, debtor designee and no other creditors or parties made an appearance. Order/Disposition due by 08/17/2017. (moreheadd) |
|
Saturday, July 29, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Sun 07/30 12:28 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
20 | 20
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Sun 07/30 12:28 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure
Fri 07/28 12:33 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors
Fri 07/28 12:33 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Admin.) |
|
17 | 17
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency
Fri 07/28 12:33 AM
Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/27 12:34 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices, Pleadings and Orders filed by Mark J. Friedman of DLA Piper US LLP on behalf of Schlotzsky's Franchise LLC.(Friedman, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing
Thu 07/27 12:02 PM
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2017 at 11:00 AM at Chief Judge St. John's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom 1, Norfolk, Virginia. (Jones, Diane) |
|
14 | 14
order
Designation
Thu 07/27 8:44 AM
Order of Designation; designating Larry Seas to perform duties imposed upon the debtor by the Bankruptcy Code (Jones, Diane) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
Confirmation of Request for Hearing
Wed 07/26 5:00 PM
Confirmation of Request for Hearing, Proponent to file notice of hearing with court Hearing to be held on 8/3/2017 at 11:00 AM at Chief Judge St. John's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom 1, Norfolk, Virginia. (Atkins, Julie) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 07/26 4:24 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. on behalf of Lorilar Enterprises, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2017 at 11:00 AM at Chief Judge St. John's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom 1, Norfolk, Virginia.(Crowley, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
11 | 11
motion
Expedite Hearing
Wed 07/26 1:03 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Authorize Payment of Pre-Petition Wages filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. on behalf of Lorilar Enterprises, Inc.. (Crowley, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use)
Wed 07/26 12:59 PM
Notice of Motion to Authorize Payment of Pre-Petition Wages filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. on behalf of Lorilar Enterprises, Inc..(Crowley, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
9 | 9
motion
Authorize
Wed 07/26 12:56 PM
Motion to Authorize Payment of Pre-Petition Wages filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. on behalf of Lorilar Enterprises, Inc.. (Crowley, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Service List | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use)
Wed 07/26 11:05 AM
Notice of Motion - Notice of Application to Employ Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. as Counsel filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. on behalf of Lorilar Enterprises, Inc..(Crowley, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Service List | ||
7 | 7
motion
Employ
Wed 07/26 11:01 AM
Application to Employ Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. as Counsel filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. on behalf of Lorilar Enterprises, Inc.. (Crowley, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Service List | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Resolution
Tue 07/25 1:33 PM
Corporate Resolution filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. on behalf of Lorilar Enterprises, Inc.. (Crowley, Karen) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Forms Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors
Tue 07/25 12:54 PM
Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341 meeting to be held on 8/30/2017 at 10:00 AM at Office of the U.S. Trustee (Chapter 11), 200 Granby Street, Federal Building, Room 625, Norfolk, VA. Proof of Claims due by 11/28/2017. Complaint for Determination of Dischargeability of Debt due by 10/30/2017. (Jones, Diane) |
|
4 | 4
court
Deficient Filing Notice Request
Tue 07/25 12:44 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to Karen M. Crowley - If corporate debtor: not accompanied by corporate resolution authorizing filing Document(s) due by 8/8/2017. (Jones, Diane) |
|
3 | 3
court
1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
Tue 07/25 12:38 PM
LBR 1007-1 Schedule(s) and/or Statement Deficiency; Incomplete Filings due by 8/7/2017. (Jones, Diane) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/25 9:15 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 17-72640 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26677522, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
25
pgs
misc
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Mon 07/24 4:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C. on behalf of Lorilar Enterprises, Inc.. (Crowley, Karen) |