Connecticut District Court
Judge:Michael P Shea
Referred: Joan G Margolis
Case #: 3:17-cv-01302
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2017
Terminated:Mar 09, 2018

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
26 26 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/20 2:35 PM
ORDER. The parties'25 stipulation for allowance of fees is APPROVED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/20/2018. (Taykhman, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 16, 2018
25 25 misc Stipulation Fri 03/16 3:44 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Attorney's Fees under the EAJA by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Peck, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 09, 2018
24 24 order Judgment Fri 03/09 10:57 AM
JUDGMENT filed and entered remanding for further proceedings. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 3/9/18.(Johnson, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 03/09 11:00 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
23 23 order Order on Motion to Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner Thu 03/08 4:56 PM
ORDER. In light of the Court's 22 order reversing the Commissioner's decision and remanding for further proceedings, the Plaintiff's19 motion to reverse is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/8/2018. (Taykhman, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
22 22 order Order on Motion to Remand to Agency Tue 03/06 10:46 AM
ORDER. Defendant's21 consent motion for entry of judgment under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) with reversal and remand to the Commissioner of Social Security is GRANTED. The Court hereby REVERSES the Commissioner's decision and REMANDS the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to remand this case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/6/2018. (Taykhman, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
21 21 motion Remand to Agency Mon 03/05 5:30 PM
Consent MOTION to Remand to Agency - no response from Plaintiff should be required - Cert. of Service at end of dcoument by Nancy A. Berryhill.Responses due by 3/26/2018 (Peck, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/16 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P. Peck on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Peck, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
19 19 motion Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner Fri 01/12 2:54 PM
MOTION to Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner by Norberto Casanova.(Ciccarillo, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts
Friday, December 08, 2017
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/08 10:14 AM
ORDER. Plaintiff's17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Reverse is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/8/2017. (Taykhman, N.)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/11 10:16 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 1/12/2018 (Johnson, D.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2017
17 17 motion Extension of Time Thu 12/07 11:45 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until January 12, 2018 Motion to Reverse and Memorandum in Support by Norberto Casanova. (Ciccarillo, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2017
16 16 order Order of Transfer Fri 11/03 8:57 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 11/3/2017.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2017
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/16 12:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Government having filed its answer and the administrative record (Doc. No. 14), the court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order: Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand and a supporting memorandum of law on or before DECEMBER 12, 2017 . Defendant shall file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand on or before FEBRUARY 12, 2018 . Plaintiff may file a reply brief pursuant to Local Rule 7(d) on or before FEBRUARY 26, 2018 . Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, counsel are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate. The court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Scheduling Order which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions and supporting memoranda. (Doc. No. 7.) The parties should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case. To expedite the courts consideration of these motions, counsel for the parties must confer to prepare a Stipulation of Facts based on the administrative record. The Stipulation of Facts shall contain page citations to the administrative record and be filed as a separate document contemporaneously with the plaintiffs motion, on or before DECEMBER 12, 2017 . In the unusual case in which some factual disputes remain, plaintiff shall file as an exhibit to her motion a statement containing those remaining disputed facts, again with specific citations to the record. Counsel for plaintiff must also provide the court with an affidavit detailing the efforts made to reach agreement as to the material facts. Unless defendant files a motion for voluntary remand, defendant shall file, as an exhibit to its motion, a response to plaintiffs statement containing disputed facts, either (1) agreeing with the statement as presented or (2) disagreeing with the statement or (3) indicating any material omissions. Once again, any submission must contain specific citations to the record supporting each assertion in the statement. Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion. Requests for extensions of these deadlines are discouraged and, unless unusual circumstances dictate otherwise, counsel should not seek an extension of greater than 30 days. Any motion for extension of a deadline must include a showing of good cause as required by Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three days before the existing deadline. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2017. (Dispositive Motions due by 12/12/2017)(DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/16 11:59 AM
NOTICE by Norberto Casanova Notice, Consent & Reference of a Civil Action to A Magistrate Judge (Ciccarillo, Dennis)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/16 11:20 AM
REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2017.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/16 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca H. Estelle on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Estelle, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
11 11 answer Answer with Transcripts - Social Security Case Fri 10/13 2:55 PM
ANSWER with Transcripts by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Estelle, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AR - Certification Page,
Att: 2 AR - Court Transcript Index,
Att: 3 AR - Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing,
Att: 4 AR - Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 5 AR - Jurisdictional Documents and Notices,
Att: 6 AR - Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 AR - Disability Related Development,
Att: 8 AR - Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 9 AR - Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 10 AR - Medical Records Part 3,
Att: 11 AR - Medical Records Part 4,
Att: 12 AR - Medical Records Part 5,
Att: 13 AR - Medical Records Part 6
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 08/22 8:15 AM
Answer deadline updated for Nancy A. Berryhill to 10/16/2017. (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2017
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Mon 08/21 11:10 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint served on Social Security Admin., U.S. Dept. of Justice, U.S. Attorney's Office on August 8, 2017, filed by Norberto Casanova. (Ciccarillo, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 08/08 1:13 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Nancy A. Berryhill* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Dennis G. Ciccarillo* *Michalik, Bauer, Silvia & Ciccarillo, LLP* *35 Pearl St., Suite 300* *New Britain, CT 06051*. (Campbell, A)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Tue 08/08 8:50 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Nancy A. Berryhill. (Ciccarillo, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 08/07 12:09 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/7/17. (Margolis, Joan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Wed 08/02 1:39 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint filed by Norberto Casanova,4 Notice re: Assignment of Social Security Appeals,2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Norberto Casanova,6 Electronic Filing Order,3 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals,5 Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Clerk on 8/2/2017.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 08/02 1:35 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/2/2017.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Scheduling Order Wed 08/02 1:35 PM
Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/2/2017.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Wed 08/02 1:34 PM
Notice re: Assignment of Social Security Appeals Signed by Clerk on 8/2/2017.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Wed 08/02 1:33 PM
Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/2/2017.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 08/02 1:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Norberto Casanova. (Ciccarillo, Dennis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/02 12:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Norberto Casanova.(Ciccarillo, Dennis)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 08/02 1:37 PM
Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge Joan G. Margolis added. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]