Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:17-mj-02671
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2017
Terminated:Aug 09, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 14, 2018 4:07 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stephen G. Jurecky
U.S. Attorneys Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mirella Camacho (1)
Terminated: 08/09/2017
Represented By
Maria B. Ramirez
Law Office Of Maria B. Ramirez
contact info
Material Witness
Manuel Alfredo Baca-Varela
Terminated: 08/09/2017
Represented By
Danny Razo
Law Office Of Danny Razo
contact info
Material Witness
Osvaldo Rodriguez-Garcia
Terminated: 08/09/2017
Represented By
Danny Razo
Law Office Of Danny Razo
contact info


Friday, July 14, 2017
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND SET as to Mirella Camacho by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER SETTING BOND for Material Witness MAT WIT 1 & MAT WIT 2 in case as to Mirella Camacho. BOND SET AT: $1OK UNSECURED by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower as to Mirella Camacho. (mg2)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Mirella Camacho. (mg2)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Mirella Camacho. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Initial Appearance as to Mirella Camacho held on 7/14/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Mirella Camacho (Court Reporter ERO.) (mg2)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Mirella Camacho, ( Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 7/19/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Leon Schydlower,). Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Mirella Camacho (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (mg2)
Related: [-]
7 7 AFFIDAVIT for Material Witness MAT WIT 1 & MAT WIT 2 in case as to Mirella Camacho. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Initial Appearance for Material Witness MAT WIT 1 in case as to Mirella Camacho held on 7/14/2017 SPANISH Language Interpreter required, (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter ERO.)(mg2)
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Initial Appearance for Material Witness MAT WIT 2 in case as to Mirella Camacho held on 7/14/2017 SPANISH Language Interpreter required, (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter ERO.)(mg2)
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 20 for Material Witness MAT WIT 1 in case as to Mirella Camacho. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
12 12 Order Appointing Counsel for Material Witness MAT WIT 2 in case as to Mirella Camacho. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND MATERIAL WITNESS DEPOSITION for Material Witness MAT WIT 1 & MAT WIT 2 in case as to Mirella Camacho. Status Conference is set for Tuesday, August 8,2017, at 10:30 AM. Deposition is set for Wednesday, August 9, 2017, at 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER SETTING BOND FOR MATERIAL WITNESS for Material Witness MAT WIT 1 in case as to Mirella Camacho. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER SETTING BOND FOR MATERIAL WITNESS for Material Witness MAT WIT 2 in case as to Mirella Camacho. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
16 16 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT for Material Witness MAT WIT 1 in case as to Mirella Camacho. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]
17 17 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT for Material Witness MAT WIT 2 in case as to Mirella Camacho. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (mg2)
Related: [-]