New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alvin K Hellerstein
Case #: 1:17-cv-06133
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2017
Terminated:May 24, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2018 5:01 AM EST
Defendant
Christopher Berisford
Represented By
Andrew P. Merten
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Jina Moon
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Jason P. Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Defendant
Melanie Francis
Represented By
Andrew P. Merten
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Jina Moon
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Jason P. Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Defendant
Please Hold (UK) Limited
Represented By
Andrew P. Merten
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Jina Moon
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Jason P. Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Defendant
The Porter Group Inc.
Represented By
Ilan Weiser
Greenwald Doherty, LLP
contact info
Kevin Michael Doherty
Greenwald Doherty, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark Williamson
Represented By
Andrew P. Merten
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Jina Moon
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Jason P. Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryan Koegel
Represented By
Michael Antonio Faillace
Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Joshua S. Androphy
Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
PH Media (USA) Inc.
Terminated: 11/02/2017
Represented By
Jina Moon
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Jason P. Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Defendant
Grant Lawrence Reed
Terminated: 11/02/2017
Represented By
Jina Moon
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info
Jason P. Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen, Llp( Ny)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
62 62 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 02/19 11:23 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Sara Jacqueline Isaacson terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/19/2019) (ne)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 18, 2019
61 61 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 02/18 10:57 AM
MOTION for Sara Jacqueline Isaacson to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Bryan Koegel.(Isaacson, Sara)
Related: [-]