|
GPO
Nov 09 2017
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART: re 17 Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery in Aid of Service and Extend Time for Service. Plaintiff must effect service over Defendants by FEBRUARY 12, 2018. As the Motion relates to Plaintiff seeking the Court to authorize the broad request for expedited discovery, Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 9, 2017. (jlk)
|
|
GPO
Apr 13 2018
OPINION AND ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 23 Plt's Renewed Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery; Granting 24 Plt's Motion for Service by Publication; Denying As Moot 33 Plt's Motion to Extend Time for Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/13/2018. (sln)
|
|
GPO
Aug 20 2018
ORDER granting 31 Motion Discovery in Aid of Default Judgment against Defendant Moonbase Holdings, LLC. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a written status report by 10/1/2018, unless he has filed a motion for default judgment against Defendant Moonbase Holdings, LLC prior to that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 20, 2018. (jlk)
|
|
GPO
Dec 21 2018
ORDER AND OPINION: Plaintiffs Motion for Additional Discovery in Aid of Default Judgment 46 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file with the Court, ex parte and under seal, the complete subpoena with the full name of the financial institution to which it will be issued within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order. The Court will then determine whether to keep the document under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 21, 2018. (jlk)
|
|
GPO
May 01 2019
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Obeidallah's Motion for Default Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 55 Obeidallah's Supplement. The Court enters judgment in Obeidallah's favor against Defendants regarding liability. To determine the proper amount of damages and fees, the Court will hold an evidentiary hearing at a later date. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/1/2019. (cmw)
|
|
GPO
May 29 2019
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Use Greg Anglin's Deposition Testimony at the Evidentiary Hearing or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Issue a Subpoena for Greg Anglin's Appearance and Testimony. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/28/2019. (kk)
|