Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Charles J Kahn, Jr
Case #: 3:17-cv-00667
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2017
Terminated:Oct 10, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Mar 04, 2018 3:18 AM EST
Defendant
TIMOTHY CHARLES HOLMSETH
320 17TH ST NW UNIT 17
EAST GRAND FORKS, MN 56721
Plaintiff
THOMAS NORMAN OLSEN

GPO Sep 11 2017
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Recommended that Santa Rosa County Circuit Court Case No. 17-1251-DR be REMANDED to the state court from which it was removed. That the clerk be directed to close the file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 9/11/2017. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/10/2017. (sdw)
GPO Oct 10 2017
ORDER ADOPTING 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Santa Rosa County Circuit Court Case No. 17-1251-DR is REMANDED to the state court from which it was removed. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/10/2017. (copy sent to Santa Rosa County Circuit Court) (sdw)

Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
5 5 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Order on Report and Recommendation Tue 10/10 11:52 AM
ORDER ADOPTING 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Santa Rosa County Circuit Court Case No. 17-1251 DR is REMANDED to the state court from which it was removed. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/10/2017. (copy sent to Santa Rosa County Circuit Court) (sdw)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 10/10 9:06 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (no objections filed) (sdw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2017
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/18 2:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TIMOTHY CHARLES HOLMSETH. (missing signature) (sdw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 09/11 12:58 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Recommended that Santa Rosa County Circuit Court Case No. 17-1251 DR be REMANDED to the state court from which it was removed. That the clerk be directed to close the file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 9/11/2017. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/10/2017 . (sdw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
2 2 notice Notice to Pro Se Tue 09/05 1:39 PM
Notice to Pro Se litigant TIMOTHY CHARLES HOLMSETH. (sdw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 09/05 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TIMOTHY CHARLES HOLMSETH. (no filing fee/IFP motion received) (sdw)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 09/05 1:39 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:1 Notice of Removal. (sdw)
Related: [-]