Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51230
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2017
Terminated:Jun 25, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
A-1 Portables and Services
P.O. Box 1181
Casper, WY 82602
Represented By
A-1 Portables and Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, June 25, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/25 10:26 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51230 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 03, 2018
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 06/04 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 06/03/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 06/04 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 06/03/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, June 01, 2018
16 16 court Default Judgment - NO Interest (VAN-433b) Fri 06/01 9:41 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant A-1 Portables and Services. Related [+] Signed on 6/1/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 13
15 15 court Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431) Fri 06/01 9:37 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against A-1 Portables and Services Related [+] Signed on 6/1/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, May 31, 2018
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/31 1:43 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 12 ,13
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Thu 05/31 1:42 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 12 12
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment by Default
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Thu 05/31 1:41 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
Friday, January 12, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
10 10 15 pgs order Order Fri 01/05 2:42 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 1/3/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:29 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 12:27 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 1:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz, in his capacity as Settlement Trustee. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 12:22 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz, in his capacity as Settlement Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 10/10 12:45 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant A-1 Portables and Services. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 09/12 3:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51230 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89594, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 09/12 11:46 AM
Adversary case 17-51230 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against A-1 Portables and Services. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives