Kravitz v. Crest Resources, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-51233 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Crest Resources, Inc.
15 E 5th St Suite 3650
Tulsa, OK 74103 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 09/25 12:43 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51233 Closed (LB) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 09/12 3:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51233 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89594, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 17-51233 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Crest Resources, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |