Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51244
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2017
Terminated:Feb 15, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Southwest Measurement, Inc.
33 Hunter Court
Durango, CO 81302
Represented By
Southwest Measurement, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, February 15, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/15 9:02 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51244 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
12 12 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 02/14 2:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 12, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
10 10 15 pgs order Order Fri 01/05 3:02 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 1/3/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:43 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 2:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:33 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 10/10 2:50 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Southwest Measurement, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 09/12 3:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51244 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89594, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 09/12 1:32 PM
Adversary case 17-51244 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Southwest Measurement, Inc. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives