Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51257
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2017
Terminated:Feb 05, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
D. E. Chase, Inc.
1445 South Barnes
Pampa, TX 79065
Represented By
D. E. Chase, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/05 11:41 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 ,3 ,13 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/05 3:12 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51257 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
20 20 mediation Mediation Status Report Wed 01/23 3:13 PM
Mediation Status Report (Haber, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
19 19 notice Mediation - Notice Mon 12/17 4:32 PM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 08, 2018
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 10/08 11:16 AM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 04, 2018
17 17 notice Notice and Order of Request for Status Report Thu 10/04 11:47 AM
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report With Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 10/25/2018. Signed on 10/4/2018. (Mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2018
16 16 notice Service - Notice Mon 06/04 12:27 PM
Notice of Service of Response to First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by D. E. Chase, Inc. (Billion, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
15 15 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 03/12 9:53 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/05 10:50 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by D. E. Chase, Inc.. (Billion, Mark)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/05 10:46 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by D. E. Chase, Inc. Mediation due date: 07/3/2018. (Billion, Mark)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, January 12, 2018
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service for the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
11 11 10 pgs order Order Thu 12/28 3:16 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 12/28/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:29 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:00 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 1:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz, in his capacity as Settlement Trustee. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2017
5 5 notice Appearance - Notice Wed 11/08 1:42 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by D. E. Chase, Inc. (Billion, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 12:22 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz, in his capacity as Settlement Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 10/10 1:14 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant D. E. Chase, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 09/12 3:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51257 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89594, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 09/12 1:59 PM
Adversary case 17-51257 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against D. E. Chase, Inc. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives