Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51265
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2017
Terminated:Oct 05, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Chaparral Energy, LLC
701 Cedar Lake Boulevard
Oklahoma City, OK 73114
Represented By
Chaparral Energy, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, October 05, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/05 12:09 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51265 Closed (MDW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2017
5 5 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Wed 10/04 7:46 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Document Filed in Error Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 3
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 10/04 7:38 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 02, 2017
3 3 notice Dismissal - Notice Mon 10/02 3:04 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 09/12 3:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51265 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89594, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 09/12 2:11 PM
Adversary case 17-51265 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Chaparral Energy, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives