Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51266
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2017
Terminated:Jun 28, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sierra Construction Company, Inc.
190 Jackson Street
Linch, WY 82640
Represented By
Sierra Construction Company, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, June 28, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/28 1:48 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51266 Closed (Mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/26 2:42 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 ,5 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/14 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 06/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, June 11, 2018
16 16 1 pgs court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Mon 06/11 8:48 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] Signed on 6/11/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, June 08, 2018
15 15 notice Mediation - Notice Fri 06/08 2:20 PM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
14 14 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Fri 06/08 12:00 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
12 12 15 pgs order Order Fri 01/05 3:02 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 1/3/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:43 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 2:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2017
6 6 misc Opt-In Certificate Wed 11/08 2:47 PM
Certificate Pursuant to DEL. BANKR. L.R. 9019-5(j)(iii) Filed by Sierra Construction Company, Inc. (MDW)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/07 8:58 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Sierra Construction Company, Inc. Mediation due date: 3/6/2018. (LMD)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:33 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 10/10 2:34 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Sierra Construction Company, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 09/12 3:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51266 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89594, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 09/12 2:14 PM
Adversary case 17-51266 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Sierra Construction Company, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives