Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51272
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2017
Terminated:Jan 16, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stiles Serves LLC
15 E 5th Street Suite 3650
Tulsa, OK 74103
Represented By
Stiles Serves LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/16 11:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51272 Closed (DM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 11, 2019
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/11 3:51 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 ,3 ,13 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
21 21 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Thu 01/03 12:57 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 03/4/2019. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
20 20 notice Mediation - Notice Mon 12/17 4:54 PM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/01 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/31/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, October 29, 2018
18 18 1 pgs court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Mon 10/29 1:00 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] Signed on 10/29/2018. (Mml)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
17 17 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Wed 10/24 11:51 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
16 16 notice Service - Notice Tue 08/21 4:43 PM
Notice of Service of Responses of Stiles Services LLC to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by Stiles Serves LLC (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
15 15 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 04/26 1:18 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Plaintiff's First Set of Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
14 14 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 04/06 2:52 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Stipulation to Amend Caption to Revise Defendant's Name Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 1 ,3 ,13
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/20 4:46 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Stiles Serves LLC Mediation due date: 07/18/2018.(Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 09, 2018
12 12 motion Stipulation Fri 03/09 9:44 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between Peter Kravitz and Defendant Stiles Serves LLC . Filed by Peter Kravitz Related [+]. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, January 12, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service for the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
10 10 10 pgs order Order Thu 12/28 3:27 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 12/28/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:43 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 2:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:33 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 10/10 2:51 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Stiles Serves LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 09/12 3:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51272 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89594, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 09/12 2:28 PM
Adversary case 17-51272 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Stiles Serves LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives