Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51282
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2017
Terminated:Nov 14, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
WildHorse Resources Management Company, LLC
9805 Katy Freeway Suite 400
Houston, TX 77024
Represented By
WildHorse Resources Management Company, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/14 10:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51282 Closed (MDW)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2017
6 6 notice Dismissal - Notice Mon 11/13 4:05 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 08, 2017
5 5 motion Stipulation Wed 11/08 4:03 PM
Stipulation For Extension Of Time To Respond To The Complaint Between WildHorse Resources Management Company, LLC and Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust . Filed by WildHorse Resources Management Company, LLC Related [+]. (Culver, Donna)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:33 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 10/10 3:02 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant WildHorse Resources Management Company, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 09/12 6:32 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51282 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8580903, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 09/12 2:48 PM
Adversary case 17-51282 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against WildHorse Resources Management Company, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives