Kravitz v. Alfalfa Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-51288 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 18, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Alfalfa Electric Cooperative, Inc.
121 East Main
Cherokee, OK 73728 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 10/18 1:01 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51288 Closed (LCN) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz, in his capacity as Settlement Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Alfalfa Electric Cooperative, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 09/12 6:32 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51288 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8580903, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 17-51288 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Alfalfa Electric Cooperative, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |