Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51290
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2017
Terminated:Feb 21, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Z-W Inc.
8840 County Road 10
Pampa, TX 75201
Represented By
Z-W Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 21, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/21 2:59 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51290 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/19 2:14 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 ,3 ,13 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
26 26 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Thu 01/24 9:57 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 03/25/2019. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
25 25 notice Mediation - Notice Tue 12/18 11:20 AM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/01 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/31/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23
Monday, October 29, 2018
23 23 1 pgs court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Mon 10/29 1:39 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] Signed on 10/29/2018. (Mml)
Related: [-] 22
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
22 22 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Wed 10/24 11:52 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 12, 2018
21 21 notice Service - Notice Fri 10/12 8:07 PM
Notice of Service Regarding Responses and Objections of Z-W, Inc. to First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by Z-W Inc. (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Service - Notice Fri 10/12 8:02 PM
Notice of Service Regarding Responses and Objections of Z-W, Inc. to First Set of Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by Z-W Inc. (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 08, 2018
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 10/08 11:16 AM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to The Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
18 18 notice Notice and Order of Request for Status Report Fri 09/28 12:48 PM
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report With Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 10/19/2018. Signed on 9/28/2018. (Mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
17 17 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 05/11 4:42 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery /Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Z-W Inc. dba Crall Products Company's, First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
16 16 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 03/29 11:49 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Defendants First Set of Discovery Related [+] Directed to Plaintiff Filed by Z-W Inc. (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-] quests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production of Documents
15 15 notice Service - Notice Thu 03/29 11:15 PM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures of Defendant Filed by Z-W Inc. (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
14 14 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 03/12 9:57 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/06 5:59 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Z-W Inc. Mediation due date: 06/6/2018.(Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 12, 2018
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service for the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 30, 2017
11 11 notice Appearance - Notice Sat 12/30 11:08 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Z-W Inc. (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
10 10 10 pgs order Order Thu 12/28 3:28 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 12/28/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:43 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 2:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:33 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 10/10 3:06 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Z-W Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 09/12 6:32 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51290 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8580903, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 09/12 3:15 PM
Adversary case 17-51290 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Z-W Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives