Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51332
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2017
Terminated:May 16, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
All Media Integration LLC
12626 E. 60th Street Suite 108
Tulsa, OK 74146
Represented By
All Media Integration LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 16, 2019
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/16 10:58 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal /Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/16 1:38 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51332 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
33 33 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Fri 03/22 3:57 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Haber, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 18, 2019
32 32 notice Mediation - Notice Fri 01/18 10:26 AM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 17, 2019
31 31 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/17 10:03 AM
Order Granting Motion Related [+] Order Signed on 1/16/2019. (LCN)
Related: [-] 30
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
30 30 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 01/16 10:07 AM
Certification of Counsel Related [+] Filed by All Media Integration LLC. (Tobia, James)
Related: [-] 12 ,29
Att: 1 Stipulation Of The Parties To Amend The Procedures Order Deadlines
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
29 29 notice Mediation - Notice Tue 12/18 11:18 AM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, November 09, 2018
28 28 mediation Conflict Review Fri 11/09 11:38 AM
Conflict Review Pursuant to Local Rule 9019-2(e)(iii)(B) (Haber, Eric)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 28, 2018
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/29 1:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26
Friday, October 26, 2018
26 26 1 pgs court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Fri 10/26 3:26 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Eric J. Haber is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 10/26/2018. (DM)
Related: [-] 25
25 25 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Fri 10/26 12:31 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
24 24 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 07/26 12:08 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to All Media Integration, LLC's First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
23 23 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 07/17 10:17 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Roland Gary Jones, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 7/17/2018. (JMW)
Related: [-] 22
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
22 22 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 07/10 1:32 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Roland Gary Jones, Esquire . Receipt Number 0311-23260, Filed by All Media Integration LLC. (Tobia, James) Modified text on 7/11/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 22, 2018
21 21 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 06/22 1:17 PM
L Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by All Media Integration LLC. (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
20 20 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 06/22 1:14 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by All Media Integration LLC (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Lty Certificate of Service of Defendants' Amended Response to Plaintiffs Request for Documents and Defendants Amended Response to Plaintiffs Request for Interrogatories
Monday, May 21, 2018
19 19 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 05/21 3:37 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by All Media Integration LLC (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs Request for Documents and Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Request for Interrogatories
Friday, May 04, 2018
18 18 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 05/04 12:12 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to All Media Integration LLC's First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
17 17 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 04/12 11:48 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by All Media Integration LLC (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service of Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs Request for Admissions
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
16 16 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Wed 03/28 10:21 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by All Media Integration LLC (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service for Defendant's Initial Disclosures
Monday, March 12, 2018
15 15 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 03/12 10:02 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
14 14 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 03/05 11:25 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Defendant's First Set of Document Requests and First Set of Interrogatories Filed by All Media Integration LLC (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Srvice of Defendant's First Set of Document Requests and First Set of Interrogatories
Friday, January 12, 2018
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service for the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
12 12 10 pgs order Order Thu 12/28 3:13 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 12/28/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:29 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 12:27 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 1:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz, in his capacity as Settlement Trustee. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2017
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/07 10:50 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by All Media Integration LLC Mediation due date: 03/7/2018.(Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
5 5 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 11/07 10:47 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by All Media Integration LLC (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 12:22 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz, in his capacity as Settlement Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 10/11 1:23 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant All Media Integration LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/13 2:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51332 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89597, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/13 1:15 PM
Adversary case 17-51332 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against All Media Integration LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/12/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives