Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51341
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2017
Terminated:Aug 21, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
North Star Energy & Construction, LLC
135 Pine Street
Buffalo, WY 82834
Represented By
North Star Energy & Construction, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/21 9:06 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51341 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/09 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/08/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/09 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/08/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, August 06, 2018
21 21 court Default Judgment - NO Interest (VAN-433b) Mon 08/06 4:05 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant North Star Energy & Construction, LLC. Related [+] Signed on 8/6/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 19
20 20 court Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431) Mon 08/06 4:04 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant North Star Energy & Construction, LLC Related [+] Signed on 8/6/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, August 03, 2018
19 19 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Fri 08/03 3:40 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 18 18
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment by Default
18 18 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Fri 08/03 3:39 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 12, 2018
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
16 16 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 01/05 5:07 PM
Affidavit of Service Re: Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 8, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 01/05 5:04 PM
Affidavit of Service Re: Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 8, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
14 14 15 pgs order Order Fri 01/05 2:55 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 1/3/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Fri 01/05 12:34 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 1/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Thu 01/04 11:31 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 1/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:20 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2017
6 6 cmp Alias Summons Thu 11/09 4:26 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant North Star Energy & Construction, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/8/2018. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 1 ,3 ,5
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
5 5 cmp Alias Summons Wed 10/25 12:09 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant North Star Energy & Construction, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/26/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:33 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 10/11 3:02 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant North Star Energy & Construction, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/13 2:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51341 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89597, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/13 1:34 PM
Adversary case 17-51341 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against North Star Energy & Construction, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/12/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives