Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51348
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2017
Terminated:Jan 30, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Oldco Wind Down, Inc.
1707 Cole Boulevard, Suite 200
Golden, CO 80401
Represented By
Oldco Wind Down, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
New IPT, Inc.
1707 Cole Boulevard, Suite 200
Golden, CO 80401
Represented By
New IPT, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/30 11:37 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51348 Closed (LB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
15 15 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 01/26 12:10 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 12, 2018
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service for the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
13 13 10 pgs order Order Thu 12/28 3:21 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 12/28/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 11/29 11:12 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding of Defendant New IPT, Inc., dba Integrated Petroleum Technologies Only Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:31 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2017
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 11/17 3:11 PM
Certification of Counsel for Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, November 09, 2017
5 5 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Motion Thu 11/09 2:50 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by New IPT, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Brown, Charles)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:33 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 10/11 3:05 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants New IPT, Inc., Oldco Wind Down, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/13 2:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51348 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89597, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/13 1:46 PM
Adversary case 17-51348 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Oldco Wind Down, Inc., New IPT, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/12/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives