Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51353
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2017
Terminated:Aug 22, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
P2ES Holdings, LLC
1670 Broadway, Suite 2800
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
P2ES Holdings, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 19, 2018
16 16 notice Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 10/19 11:43 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,14 ,15
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/22 11:38 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51353 Closed (Mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
15 15 court Default Judgment - NO Interest (VAN-433b) Tue 08/07 9:56 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant P2ES Holdings, LLC, dba P2 Energy Solutions. Related [+] Tickle due by: 8/21/2018. Signed on 8/7/2018. (SJS)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431) Tue 08/07 9:55 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant P2ES Holdings, LLC, dba P2 Energy Solutions Related [+]. Signed on 8/7/2018. (SJS)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, August 03, 2018
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Fri 08/03 3:52 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 12 12
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment by Default
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Fri 08/03 3:51 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 12, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
10 10 15 pgs order Order Fri 01/05 3:02 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 1/3/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:31 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 2:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:33 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 10/11 3:08 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant P2ES Holdings, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/13 2:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51353 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89597, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/13 1:55 PM
Adversary case 17-51353 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against P2ES Holdings, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/12/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives