Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51357
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2017
Terminated:Oct 05, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Plus Relocation Services, Inc.
600 Highway 169 South, Suite 500
Minneapolis, MN 55426
Represented By
Plus Relocation Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, October 05, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/05 2:44 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51357 Closed (MDW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2017
3 3 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 10/03 2:47 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/13 2:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51357 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89597, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/13 2:04 PM
Adversary case 17-51357 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Plus Relocation Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/12/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives