Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51380
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2017
Terminated:Nov 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Four-K Services, Inc.
1821 Willard Avenue
Canadian, TX 79014
Represented By
Four-K Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, November 17, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 11/17 11:21 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51380 Closed (MDW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2017
6 6 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 11/16 2:37 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 13, 2017
5 5 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:21 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/12 11:04 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 10/11 2:10 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Four-K Services, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, September 14, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/14 9:16 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51380 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8582804, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/13 2:58 PM
Adversary case 17-51380 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Four-K Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/12/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives