Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51382
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2017
Terminated:Oct 05, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
FTS International, Inc.
777 Main Street Suite 3000
Fort Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
FTS International, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, October 05, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/05 2:49 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51382 Closed (MDW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2017
3 3 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 10/04 9:16 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/14 9:16 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51382 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8582804, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/13 3:04 PM
Adversary case 17-51382 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against FTS International, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/12/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives