Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51388
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2017
Terminated:Apr 03, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd.
Represented By
Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Justin R. Alberto
Bayard, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/03 2:12 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51388 Closed (MML)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
15 15 motion Stipulation Fri 03/30 10:08 AM
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Between Peter Kravitz and Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd. . Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
14 14 notice Service - Notice Mon 03/12 4:04 PM
Notice of Service of Stallion Oilfield Services, Ltd's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Filed by Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd. (Phillips, Marc)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Service - Notice Mon 03/12 11:37 AM
Notice of Service Re: Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Peter Kravitz (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2018
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/08 11:26 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd. Mediation due date: 06/8/2018.(Phillips, Marc)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 12, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service Re:Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
10 10 10 pgs order Order Thu 12/28 3:27 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 12/28/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 11:03 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Amended Agenda for Hearing on November 28, 2017 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:43 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 2:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 6:05 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 10/12 4:54 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Plaintiff Peter Kravitz. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/13 4:00 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51388 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8582421, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/13 3:18 PM
Adversary case 17-51388 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/12/2017. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives