Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51409
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2017
Terminated:Jul 19, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jackie Paul Boatman
34 Highway 34
Camargo, OK 73835
Represented By
Jackie Paul Boatman
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, July 19, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/19 9:46 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51409 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/06 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/05/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, July 04, 2018
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/05 1:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/04/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, July 02, 2018
16 16 court Default Judgment - NO Interest (VAN-433b) Mon 07/02 5:50 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant, Jackie Paul Boatman. Related [+] Tickle due by: 7/16/2018. Signed on 7/2/2018. (Mml)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 court Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431) Mon 07/02 5:25 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant, Jackie Paul Boatman Related [+] Signed on 7/2/2018. (Mml)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, June 28, 2018
14 14 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Thu 06/28 4:14 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 13 13
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment by Default
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Thu 06/28 4:10 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 12, 2018
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
11 11 15 pgs order Order Fri 01/05 2:55 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 1/3/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:29 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:12 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
5 5 cmp Alias Summons Wed 10/25 12:05 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Jackie Paul Boatman. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/26/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:21 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 10/11 2:41 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Jackie Paul Boatman. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, September 14, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/14 9:16 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51409 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8582804, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/13 5:29 PM
Adversary case 17-51409 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Jackie Paul Boatman. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/12/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives