Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51449
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2017
Terminated:Oct 30, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cimarex Energy Co.
1700 Lincoln Street Suite 3700
Denver, CO 80203
Represented By
Cimarex Energy Co.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 30, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/30 12:42 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51449 Closed (LB)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2017
5 5 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 10/27 2:23 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 12:22 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz, in his capacity as Settlement Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 10/12 2:01 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Cimarex Energy Co.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, September 14, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/14 3:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51449 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89602, amount $ 350.00. (VIB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 09/14 1:51 PM
Adversary case 17-51449 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Cimarex Energy Co.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/13/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives