Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51455
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2017
Terminated:Feb 21, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stallion Rockies Ltd.
950 Corbindale Road, #300
Houston, TX 77024
Represented By
Stallion Rockies Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, February 21, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/21 2:57 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51455 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/19 12:26 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 ,3 ,12 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
20 20 notice Mediation - Notice Mon 12/17 2:54 PM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Sunday, October 28, 2018
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/29 1:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, October 26, 2018
18 18 1 pgs court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Fri 10/26 1:38 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Ira L. Herman is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] Signed on 10/26/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
17 17 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Wed 10/24 11:57 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
16 16 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 05/11 4:41 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery /Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Stallion Rockies, Ltd.'s, First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Service - Notice Fri 05/11 2:02 PM
Notice of Service of Stallion Rockies, Ltd.'s Answer to Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by Stallion Rockies Ltd. (Phillips, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
14 14 notice Service - Notice Mon 03/12 4:07 PM
Notice of Service of Stallion Rockies, Ltd.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Filed by Stallion Rockies Ltd. (Phillips, Marc)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 03/12 10:09 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2018
12 12 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/08 11:31 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Stallion Rockies Ltd. Mediation due date: 06/8/2018.(Phillips, Marc)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 12, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service for the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
10 10 10 pgs order Order Thu 12/28 3:27 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 12/28/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:43 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 2:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:33 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 10/12 2:48 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Stallion Rockies Ltd.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, September 14, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/14 3:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51455 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89602, amount $ 350.00. (VIB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 09/14 2:06 PM
Adversary case 17-51455 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Stallion Rockies Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/13/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives