Kravitz v. Four Stars Pipe & Supply, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-51467 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Four Stars Pipe & Supply, Inc.
601 Dekalb Street
Farmington, NM 87401 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/05 11:20 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51467 Closed (LCN) |
||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 ,12 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman) Modified text on 4/5/2018 (LCN) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery of Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Four Stars Pipe & Supply, Inc. Mediation due date: 06/11/2018. (Hauswirth, Gregory) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Service for the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 12/28/2017. (SJS) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
![]() HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz, in his capacity as Settlement Trustee. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Four Stars Pipe & Supply, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 09/14 3:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51467 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 89602, amount $ 350.00. (VIB) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 17-51467 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Four Stars Pipe & Supply, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/13/2017. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |