Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51500
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2017
Terminated:Dec 10, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
James H. Opitz
115 Bluestem Street
Weatherford, OK 73096
Represented By
James H. Opitz
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Settlement Trustee of the Samson Settlement Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 10, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/10 3:03 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51500 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/06 2:09 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 ,3 ,26 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/18 4:36 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by James H. Opitz Mediation due date: 01/16/2019. (Macauley, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
utility Reopen AP Case Tue 08/28 6:14 PM
Adversary Case 17-51500 BLS Reopened. (Mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 27, 2018
25 25 1 pgs order Order Mon 08/27 3:12 PM
Order Vacating Default Judgment Related [+] Order Signed on 8/27/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, August 16, 2018
24 24 motion Stipulation Thu 08/16 2:07 PM
Stipulation Between James H. Opitz and the Plaintiff . Filed by James H. Opitz Related [+]. (Macauley, Thomas)
Related: [-] 15
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
23 23 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 08/14 11:46 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by James H. Opitz (Macauley, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
22 22 1 pgs order Order Fri 07/27 2:38 PM
Order (CORRECTED) Regarding Notice of Hearing to Response to Default Judgment. Related [+] Order Signed on 7/27/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 21
21 21 1 pgs order Order Fri 07/27 8:06 AM
Order Regarding Notice of Hearing to Response to Default Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 7/23/2018. (SJS)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Thu 07/26 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/25/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, July 23, 2018
19 19 court VAN-401 Generic Notice of Hearing Mon 07/23 3:16 PM
Notice of Hearing on Response to Default Judgment. Hearing scheduled for 8/22/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. The case judge is Brendan Linehan Shannon. Related [+] (SJS) Modified on 7/23/2018 (SJS)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/17 8:45 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51500 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2018
18 18 answer Response Fri 07/13 3:43 PM
Response to Default Judgment. Filed by James H. Opitz Related [+]. (SJS)
Related: [-] 15 ,14
Thursday, July 05, 2018
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/06 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/05/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/06 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/05/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, July 02, 2018
15 15 court Default Judgment - NO Interest (VAN-433b) Mon 07/02 6:02 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant, James H. Opitz dba Southwest Oilfield Service. Related [+] Tickle due by: 7/16/2018. Signed on 7/2/2018. (Mml)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431) Mon 07/02 5:40 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant, James H. Opitz dba Southwest Oilfield Service Related [+] Signed on 7/2/2018. (Mml)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, June 28, 2018
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Thu 06/28 4:19 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 12 12
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment by Default
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Thu 06/28 4:17 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 12, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/12 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
10 10 15 pgs order Order Fri 01/05 2:55 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 1/3/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 12/12 11:29 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/28 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 11/27 1:12 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 10/13 2:21 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/27/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 10/12 5:14 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant James H. Opitz. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/11/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, September 15, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 09/15 7:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51500 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8584522, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 09/14 4:46 PM
Adversary case 17-51500 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against James H. Opitz. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/13/2017. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives